This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/07/2023 at 08:41:14 (UTC).

Western National Mutual Insurance Company v. Rainbow Ranch Holdings et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 Western National Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rainbow Ranch Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Western National Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

Rainbow Ranch Holdings LLC doing business as Rainbow Ranch

Scott Nelson

Catharine Hudgens

Cross Claimant and Defendant

Catharine Hudgens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Laura Jean Hanson

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey J. Tierney

Justin P. Stalpes

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Underlying Complaint

1 #2

Ex 2 - Policy

1 #3

Ex 3 - Umbrella Policy

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Western National Mutual Insurance Company by Catharine Hudgens. (Stalpes, Justin) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. Rainbow Ranch Holdings waiver sent on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. (Hanson, Laura) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Tierney on behalf of Rainbow Ranch Holdings (Tierney, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#7

(#7) Defendant Rainbow Ranch ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rainbow Ranch Holdings. (Tierney, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement by Rainbow Ranch Holdings. (Tierney, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION Brent W. Beecher to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3044105.) Jeffrey J. Tierney appearing for Defendant Rainbow Ranch Holdings (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Tierney, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

9 #1

Affidavit

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brent Beecher NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/13/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/29/2023. (ACC) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/8/2023. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/8/2023. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/8/2023. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2023 at 02:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/30/2023. (MMS) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brent Beecher NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/13/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/29/2023. (ACC) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION Brent W. Beecher to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3044105.) Jeffrey J. Tierney appearing for Defendant Rainbow Ranch Holdings (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Tierney, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement by Rainbow Ranch Holdings. (Tierney, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant Rainbow Ranch ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rainbow Ranch Holdings. (Tierney, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Tierney on behalf of Rainbow Ranch Holdings (Tierney, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. Rainbow Ranch Holdings waiver sent on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. (Hanson, Laura) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Western National Mutual Insurance Company by Catharine Hudgens. (Stalpes, Justin) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-3014744 (HEG) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Underlying Complaint, #2 Ex 2 - Policy, #3 Ex 3 - Umbrella Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less