This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2022 at 04:42:35 (UTC).

Western National Mutual Insurance Company v. Clear Blue Energy Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 Western National Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Clear Blue Energy Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David D. Leshner and Linda Lopez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01354

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David D. Leshner

Presiding Judge

Linda Lopez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Western National Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Clear Blue Energy Corporation

Paul Santina

Lyn Santina

James Kelly

Denise Kelly

Cross Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

MARK SPAHN

A BRIGHT IDEA SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Angela A. Zanin

Mark A. Oertel

Gina G. Goldberg

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Charles Carlton

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyn Santina, Denise Kelly, Paul Santina, James Kelly, Clear Blue Energy Corporation, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ). MARK SPAHN served. (Carlton, Andrew) (ddf). (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyn Santina, Denise Kelly, Paul Santina, James Kelly, Clear Blue Energy Corporation, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ). A BRIGHT IDEA SERVICES, INC. served. (Carlton, Andrew) (ddf). (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 10/20/2022.(ddf) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ddf) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Clear Blue Energy Corporation, Denise Kelly, James Kelly, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ), Lyn Santina, Paul Santina.(Carlton, Andrew) (ddf). (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#6

(#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against MARK SPAHN, A BRIGHT IDEA SERVICES, INC., filed by Paul Santina, James Kelly, Lyn Santina, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ), Denise Kelly, Clear Blue Energy Corporation.New Summons Requested. (Carlton, Andrew) (ddf). (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipultion Regarding the Same Clear Blue Energy Corporation answer due 10/24/2022; Denise Kelly answer due 10/24/2022; James Kelly answer due 10/24/2022; James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ) answer due 10/24/2022; Lyn Santina answer due 10/24/2022; Paul Santina answer due 10/24/2022.. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 9/19/2022. (alns) (jms). (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipultion Regarding the Same by Clear Blue Energy Corporation, Denise Kelly, James Kelly, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ), Lyn Santina, Paul Santina. (Carlton, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party Clear Blue Energy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party Denise Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party James Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party James Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party Lyn Santina(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party Paul Santina(pty:dft) (ddf). (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl1) (rmc). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyn Santina, Denise Kelly, Paul Santina, James Kelly, Clear Blue Energy Corporation, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ). MARK SPAHN served. (Carlton, Andrew) (ddf). (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyn Santina, Denise Kelly, Paul Santina, James Kelly, Clear Blue Energy Corporation, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ). A BRIGHT IDEA SERVICES, INC. served. (Carlton, Andrew) (ddf). (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 10/20/2022.(ddf) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ddf) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Clear Blue Energy Corporation, Denise Kelly, James Kelly, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ), Lyn Santina, Paul Santina.(Carlton, Andrew) (ddf). (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against MARK SPAHN, A BRIGHT IDEA SERVICES, INC., filed by Paul Santina, James Kelly, Lyn Santina, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ), Denise Kelly, Clear Blue Energy Corporation.New Summons Requested. (Carlton, Andrew) (ddf). (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipultion Regarding the Same Clear Blue Energy Corporation answer due 10/24/2022; Denise Kelly answer due 10/24/2022; James Kelly answer due 10/24/2022; James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ) answer due 10/24/2022; Lyn Santina answer due 10/24/2022; Paul Santina answer due 10/24/2022.. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 9/19/2022. (alns) (jms). (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipultion Regarding the Same by Clear Blue Energy Corporation, Denise Kelly, James Kelly, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ), Lyn Santina, Paul Santina. (Carlton, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party Clear Blue Energy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party Denise Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party James Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party James Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party Lyn Santina(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Charles Carlton added to party Paul Santina(pty:dft) (ddf). (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl1) (rmc). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. Identifying Corporate Parent Colonial Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Pioneer Specialty Company, Corporate Parent Umialik Insurance Company, Corporate Parent American Freedom Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Nevada General Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Western National Finance, Corporate Parent Farmers Home Group, Other Affiliate Michigan Millers Insurance Company for Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (cxl1) (rmc). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Clear Blue Energy Corporation, Denise Kelly, James Kelly, James Kelly(as Trustee of the Kelly Family Trust ), Lyn Santina, Paul Santina ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17145373.), filed by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1354-LL-DDL. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Goldberg, Gina)(cxl1) (rmc). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less