This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2020 at 10:32:04 (UTC).

Westermayer v. Fannie Mae et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 Westermayer filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Fannie Mae. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00839

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ralf Sandro Westermayer

Bellevue, WA 98008

Defendants

Flagstar Bank FSB

Federal National Mortgage Association

Flagstar Bank

Fannie Mae

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan S. Moore

Attorney at HOUSER LLP (SEATTLE)

600 University St, Suite 1708

Seattle, WA 98101

Robert W Norman, Jr

Attorney at HOUSER LLP (SEATTLE)

600 University St, Suite 1708

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER re #9 Notice of Dismissal. Because it is unclear from Plaintiff's filing whether he seeks to dismiss this matter in this Court, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause whether he seeks dismissal by filing a notice within 14 days of the date of this Order. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS on 7/21/2020 (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION/NOTICE to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Ralf Sandro Westermayer. Noted by clerk for 8/7/2020. (LH) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. cc: Plaintiff via USPS (LW) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#7

(#7) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) PRAECIPE to attach document Corrected Signature Page re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Fannie Mae, US Treasury, Flagstar Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flagstar Bancorp, Inc., Other Affiliate MP Thrift Investments L.P. for Flagstar Bank FSB. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flagstar Bank FSB (Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Federal Housing Finance Agency for Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association (Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Flagstar Bank FSB (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit 1-2

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Ryan S. Moore re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Flagstar Bank FSB (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-08100-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6376530) Attorney Ryan S. Moore added to party Federal National Mortgage Association(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan S. Moore added to party Flagstar Bank FSB(pty:dft), filed by Flagstar Bank FSB, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2020: #2 Complaint) (RE). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER re #9 Notice of Dismissal. Because it is unclear from Plaintiff's filing whether he seeks to dismiss this matter in this Court, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause whether he seeks dismissal by filing a notice within 14 days of the date of this Order. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS on 7/21/2020 (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION/NOTICE to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Ralf Sandro Westermayer. Noted by clerk for 8/7/2020. (LH) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. cc: Plaintiff via USPS (LW) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketJudge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRAECIPE to attach document Corrected Signature Page re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Fannie Mae, US Treasury, Flagstar Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #1 Notice of Removal, was improperly signed by Robert W. Norman, Jr. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (RE) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flagstar Bancorp, Inc., Other Affiliate MP Thrift Investments L.P. for Flagstar Bank FSB. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flagstar Bank FSB (Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Federal Housing Finance Agency for Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association (Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Flagstar Bank FSB (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Ryan S. Moore re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Flagstar Bank FSB (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Moore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-08100-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6376530) Attorney Ryan S. Moore added to party Federal National Mortgage Association(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan S. Moore added to party Flagstar Bank FSB(pty:dft), filed by Flagstar Bank FSB, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2020: #2 Complaint) (RE). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less