This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2021 at 08:49:32 (UTC).

West v. MINACT, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 West filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MINACT, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roseann Ketchmark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00228

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roseann Ketchmark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick West

Defendant

MINACT, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah C. Liesen

Attorney at Edelman, Liesen & Myers

208 W Linwood

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell E. Wood

Attorney at Halbrook Wood, PC

3500 W. 75Th, Ste. 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Ashlee N Yager

Attorney at Halbrook Wood, PC

3500 W. 75Th, Ste. 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP reassignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2021. Status Conference set for 10/13/2021 10:30 AM via teleconference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2022 11:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2022 11:30 AM, Jury Trial set for 5/23/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on May 21, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Sarah C. Liesen on behalf of Plaintiff Patrick West.(Liesen, Sarah) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Defendant MINACT, Inc..(Wood, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Patrick West. (Liesen, Sarah) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MINACT, Inc. filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Defendant MINACT, Inc..(Wood, Mitchell) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses on behalf of MINACT, Inc..(Wood, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 5/2/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/16/2021. Signed on April 2, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Defendant MINACT, Inc..(Wood, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing Of Notice Of Removal by MINACT, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Wood, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, case number 21CY-CV01874, filed by Mitchell E. Wood. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7362200. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Mitchell) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2021: # 3 State Court Petition) (Woods, Gloria). Modified on 5/24/2021 to reflect attachment #3 removed as it was entered in incorrect case. (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MINACT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell E. Wood