This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 08:16:24 (UTC).

West v. Young et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 West filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Young. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01275

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kentes West

Menard, IL 62259

Defendants

Rob Jeffreys

David Gomez

Lt. Keenan Young

Nicholas J. Juarez

S. Nodine

M. Muhammed

T. Ross

Colloso

RN Lydia

RN Wendy

I.D.O.C.

Wexford Health Services Inc. Employees

Debbie Knauer

Keenan Young

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MOTION of Request for Furtherance by Plaintiff Kentes West. (jh, ) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal as to T. Ross on 4/27/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. (jmk, ) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#17

(#17) RETURN of Service of on 4/21/2022 as to S. Nodine (jg, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#16

(#16) WAIVER of service returned unexecuted as to RN Lydia, filed by Kentes West. (jg, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

15 #1

USM-285

15 #15

Main Document

14 #1

USM-285

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

USM-285

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

USM -285

#7

(#7) STATUS MOTION by Plaintiff Kentes West (Exhibit) (jmk, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Kentes West for status (Exhibits) (jg, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Kentes West for appointment of counsel (Exhibits) (jg, ) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kentes West for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (jg, ) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Motion by Kentes West. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (daj, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint by Kentes West. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION of Request for Furtherance by Plaintiff Kentes West. (jh, ) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal as to T. Ross on 4/27/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. (jmk, ) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RETURN of Service of on 4/21/2022 as to S. Nodine (jg, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER of service returned unexecuted as to RN Lydia, filed by Kentes West. (jg, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kentes West. Keenan Young waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jn, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kentes West. S. Nodine waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jn, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kentes West. M. Muhammed waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jn, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kentes West. Nicholas J. Juarez waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 USM -285)(jn, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kentes West. Colloso waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jn, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMAILED a copy of order dated 4/7/2022 to the trust fund officer at Menard-MND (jg, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS MOTION by Plaintiff Kentes West (Exhibit) (jmk, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Kentes West for status (Exhibits) (jg, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Kentes West for appointment of counsel (Exhibits) (jg, ) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kentes West for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (jg, ) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketMAILED Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to Kentes West (daj, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Motion by Kentes West. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (daj, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint by Kentes West. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IDOC is a litigant

Latest cases where WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES is a litigant