This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 08:24:10 (UTC).

WEST v. AMERICAN EXPRESS

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 WEST filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against AMERICAN EXPRESS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELISSA WEST

Defendant

AMERICAN EXPRESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yitzchak Zelman

Attorney at MARCUS & ZELMAN LLC

701 Cookman Avenue, Suite 300

Asbury Park, NJ 07712

Defendant Attorney

Brian Charles Frontino

Attorney at STROOCK & STROOCK & LAVAN LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd., Suite 3100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - First Notice

1 #3

Exhibit B - Second Notice

1 #4

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Yitzchak Zelman on behalf of Plaintiff MELISSA WEST. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to AMERICAN EXPRESS. (MAC) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#6

(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service, filed by MELISSA WEST. AMERICAN EXPRESS served on 1/24/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant AMERICAN EXPRESS. (Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Charles Frontino on behalf of Defendant AMERICAN EXPRESS. (Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2022 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/17/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2022 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/17/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Charles Frontino on behalf of Defendant AMERICAN EXPRESS. (Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant AMERICAN EXPRESS. (Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service, filed by MELISSA WEST. AMERICAN EXPRESS served on 1/24/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to AMERICAN EXPRESS. (MAC) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Yitzchak Zelman on behalf of Plaintiff MELISSA WEST. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EXPRESS, filed by MELISSA WEST. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6914104) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Second Notice, #4 Proposed Summons)(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian C. Frontino