This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 18:09:57 (UTC).

West Shore Home, LLC v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 West Shore Home, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claria Horn Boom and Regina S. Edwards. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00229

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claria Horn Boom

Referral Judge

Regina S. Edwards

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Shore Home, LLC

Defendants

Windows Plus, LLC

Russell Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas G. Collins

Attorney at Buchana Ingersoll & Rooney PC - Harrisburg

409 North Second Street, Suite 500

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Sara E. Myirski

Attorney at Buchana Ingersoll & Rooney PC - Harrisburg

409 North Second Street, Suite 500

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Kathiejane Oehler

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, Suite 2500

Louisville, KY 40202

Alina Klimkina

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, Suite 2500

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer M. Barbour

Attorney at Middleton Reutlinger

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 2600

Louisville, KY 40202

Dennis D. Murrell

Attorney at Middleton Reutlinger

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 2600

Louisville, KY 40202

Paul Joseph Hershberg

Attorney at Paul Hershberg Law, PLLC

1161 E. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40204

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by West Shore Home, LLC. (Myirski, Sara) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/10/21: Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Telephonic Status Conference by dialing the toll-free number 888-808-6929 and entering access code 2887606#. Parties shall dial into the conference five (5) minutes prior to the Conference. cc: Counsel (DJT) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Russell Smith. (Hershberg, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Windows Plus, LLC. (Murrell, Dennis) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

11 #1

Exhibit A - Proof Summons and West Shore Home LLC's Complaint were Served V

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Shore Home, LLC. Russell Smith served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof Summons and West Shore Home LLC's Complaint were Served Via Personal Service on April 14, 2021) (Oehler, Kathiejane) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

10 #1

Exhibit A - Proof Summons and West Shore Home LLC's Complaint were Served V

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Shore Home, LLC. Windows Plus, LLC served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof Summons and West Shore Home LLC's Complaint were Served Via Personal Service on April 15, 2021) (Oehler, Kathiejane) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/19/21; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sara Myirski and Thomas Collins. cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

7 #3

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Thomas Collins Pro Hac Vice

7 #2

Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support

#6

(#6) MOTION for Sara Myirski to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3325255. by Plaintiff West Shore Home, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Sara Myirski Pro Hac Vice) (Oehler, Kathiejane) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter

1 #3

Exhibit B - Employment Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit A - Verification of Jessica Gardner

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Russell Smith, Windows Plus, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3323001, filed by West Shore Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Verification of Jessica Gardner, #3 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter) (DJT) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by West Shore Home, LLC. (Myirski, Sara) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/10/21: Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Telephonic Status Conference by dialing the toll-free number 888-808-6929 and entering access code 2887606#. Parties shall dial into the conference five (5) minutes prior to the Conference. cc: Counsel (DJT) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/10/2021. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except for pretrial conference and trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Russell Smith. (Hershberg, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Windows Plus, LLC. (Murrell, Dennis) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Shore Home, LLC. Russell Smith served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof Summons and West Shore Home LLC's Complaint were Served Via Personal Service on April 14, 2021) (Oehler, Kathiejane) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Shore Home, LLC. Windows Plus, LLC served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof Summons and West Shore Home LLC's Complaint were Served Via Personal Service on April 15, 2021) (Oehler, Kathiejane) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/19/21; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sara Myirski and Thomas Collins. cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis D. Murrell on behalf of Windows Plus, LLC (Murrell, Dennis) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Thomas Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3325274. by Plaintiff West Shore Home, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Thomas Collins Pro Hac Vice) (Oehler, Kathiejane) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Sara Myirski to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3325255. by Plaintiff West Shore Home, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit Sara Myirski Pro Hac Vice) (Oehler, Kathiejane) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathiejane Oehler, Alina Klimkina on behalf of West Shore Home, LLC (DJT) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by West Shore Home, LLC. (DJT) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Russell Smith, Windows Plus, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Russell Smith) (DJT) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Russell Smith, Windows Plus, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3323001, filed by West Shore Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Verification of Jessica Gardner, #3 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter) (DJT) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Windows Plus, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST SHORE HOME LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara E. Myirski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathiejane Oehler