This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 09:15:08 (UTC).

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Osmic, Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 West Bend Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Osmic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00593

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

Hugh Osmic

Kimberly S Osmic

OSMIC, Inc,

Kimberly S. Osmic

Osmic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan B. Dailide

Attorney at Frantz Ward

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Nora E. Loftus

Attorney at Frantz Ward

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Hubert N. Osmic, Statutory Agent. Service attempted by certified mail on 3/26/21 filed on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon OSMIC, Inc. Service attempted by certified mail on 3/26/21 filed on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon OSMIC, Inc. Service attempted by certified mail on 3/26/21 filed on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Dailide, Alan) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Hubert N. Osmic, Statutory Agent. Service attempted by certified mail on 3/26/21 filed on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon OSMIC, Inc. Service attempted by certified mail on 3/26/21 filed on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon OSMIC, Inc. Service attempted by certified mail on 3/26/21 filed on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Hugh Osmic, Receipt # 7010 0780 0001 7826 9112, Kimberly Osmic, Receipt # 7010 0780 0001 7826 9143, Hubert N. Osmic, Statutory Agent (5151 Lakeside Ave.) Receipt # 7010 0780 0001 7826 9105, Osmic, Inc., Receipt # 7010 0780 0001 7826 9129, Receipt # 7010 0780 0001 7826 9136 (5209 Lakeside Ave.), placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (L,MI) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Hugh Osmic, Kimberly S. Osmic, Osmic, Inc. Hubert N. Osmic, Statutory Agent (5151 Lakeside Ave.), Osmic, Inc. (5209 Lakeside Ave.) (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketJudge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Dailide, Alan) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10717577.. Filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract Bond, #2 Exhibit B - Tabulation of Bids, #3 Exhibit C - Email dated 4/4/2017, #4 Exhibit D - Letter dated 2/8/2021, #5 Summons to Osmic, Inc., #6 Summons to Osmic, Inc., #7 Summons to Osmic, Inc., c/o Statutory Agent, #8 Summons to Huhg Osmic, #9 Summons to Kimberly Osmic, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dailide, Alan) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST BEND MUTUAL INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nora E. Loftus