This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 10:13:30 (UTC).

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Oasis International Trade, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 West Bend Mutual Insurance Company filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Oasis International Trade, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01918

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

Oasis International Trade, LLC

Oasis International Water-Friendly Solutions

LVD Acquisition, LLC doing business as Oasis International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shaun E. Young

Attorney at Keis George

55 Public Square, Suite 1900

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Oasis International Trade, LLC. (er) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Plaintiff West Bend Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Young, Shaun) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Oasis International Trade, LLC served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. (er) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against LVD Acquisition, LLC dba Oasis International, filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (Young, Shaun) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

5 #1

Summons Form

#7

(#7) Alias Summons Issued as to LVD Acquisition, LLC dba Oasis International. (tla) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19): LVD Acquisition, LLC served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (er) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19): LVD Acquisition, LLC served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (er) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Alias Summons Issued as to LVD Acquisition, LLC dba Oasis International. (tla) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against LVD Acquisition, LLC dba Oasis International, filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (Young, Shaun) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Oasis International Trade, LLC served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. (er) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Plaintiff West Bend Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Young, Shaun) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Oasis International Trade, LLC. (er) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against West Bend Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: BOHSDC-8814584), filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Young, Shaun) (Attachments 1 & 2 replaced on 4/10/2022- docs in fillable form must be flattened before filing) (er). (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST BEND MUTUAL INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shaun E. Young