This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:49:26 (UTC).

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Marion County Board of Commissioners

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 West Bend Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Marion County Board of Commissioners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00205

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant

Marion County Board of Commissioners

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc A. Sanchez

Attorney at Frantz Ward

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Alan B. Dailide

Attorney at Frantz Ward

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A -- Holverstott Bond

1 #2

Exhibit B - Holverstott_Pryor_Contract

1 #3

Exhibit C - Williams-Dalton Bond

1 #4

Exhibit D - WilliamsDalton Pryor Contract

1 #5

Exhibit E - Holverstott App GIA

1 #6

Exhibit F - Williams-Dalton App GIA

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Dailide, Alan) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, none issued. (H,JL) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Marion County Board of Commissioners. (H,JL) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#6

(#6) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/9/2022. (H,JL) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#7

(#7) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed signed Covid19 upon Marion County Board of Commissioners on 2/14/2022, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (K,AR) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed signed Covid19 upon Marion County Board of Commissioners on 2/14/2022, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (K,AR) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/9/2022. (H,JL) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (H,JL) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Marion County Board of Commissioners placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7010 0780 0001 7826 9242. (R,AP) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Marion County Board of Commissioners. (H,JL) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Dailide, Alan) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, none issued. (H,JL) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (H,JL) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketJudge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (H,JL) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Dailide, Alan) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Marion County Board of Commissioners. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11258042.. Filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Holverstott Bond, #2 Exhibit B - Holverstott_Pryor_Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Williams-Dalton Bond, #4 Exhibit D - WilliamsDalton Pryor Contract, #5 Exhibit E - Holverstott App GIA, #6 Exhibit F - Williams-Dalton App GIA, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dailide, Alan) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marion County Board of Commissioners is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST BEND MUTUAL INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc A. Sanchez