This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 06:32:44 (UTC).

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company et al v. DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 West Bend Mutual Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen C Dries and J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01335

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen C Dries

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

Nancy Lodl

Defendants

DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated

Synthes USA Products LLC

ABC Insurance Company

DEF Insurance Company

GHI Insurance Company

JKL Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rick J Mundt

Attorney at Winner Wixson & Pernitz

222 W Washington Ave - Ste 360, Po Box 2626

Madison, WI 53701

Zachary R Zellner

Attorney at Winner Wixson & Pernitz

222 W Washington Ave - Ste 360, Po Box 2626

Madison, WI 53701

Defendant Attorneys

Donn C Alexander

Attorney at Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC

40 N Central Ave - Ste 2700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Grant C Killoran

Attorney at O'Neil Cannon Hollman DeJong & Laing SC

111 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Kenneth L Moskow

Attorney at Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC

2901 N Central Ave - Ste 800

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2728

Christa D Wittenberg

Attorney at O'Neil Cannon Hollman DeJong & Laing SC

111 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated from Brown County Circuit Court, Case Number: 21-CV-1150 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3977191) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wittenberg, Christa)

1 #1

Complaint Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated. (Wittenberg, Christa)

#3

(#3) LETTER to Zachary Zellner regarding ECF registration and Admissions (sent via USPS) (jcl)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant C Killoran on behalf of DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated. Attorney(s) appearing: Grant C. Killoran (Killoran, Grant)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated.(Killoran, Grant)

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Rick J Mundt on behalf of Nancy Lodl, West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Blayne N. Steinkraus (Mundt, Rick)

#8

(#8) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated, Synthes USA Products LLC. (Wittenberg, Christa)

#9

(#9) TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/29/2022. Interim Settlement Report due by 1/3/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2023; Final Settlement Report due by 3/3/2023; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 3/10/2023; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 3/15/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (cl)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/29/2022. Interim Settlement Report due by 1/3/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2023; Final Settlement Report due by 3/3/2023; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 3/10/2023; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 3/15/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (cl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated, Synthes USA Products LLC. (Wittenberg, Christa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Rick J Mundt on behalf of Nancy Lodl, West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Blayne N. Steinkraus (Mundt, Rick)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAs of 2/9/2022, all Defendants in this matter have appeared and submitted answers. Typically, the Court would set this matter for a scheduling hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. In light of the challenges presented by the increase in COVID-19 cases, the Court will instead order the parties to submit a joint Rule 26 plan by 2/23/2022. The Court will then issue a written trial scheduling order. The parties should contact chambers if they have any questions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wittenberg, Christa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated.(Killoran, Grant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant C Killoran on behalf of DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated. Attorney(s) appearing: Grant C. Killoran (Killoran, Grant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER to Zachary Zellner regarding ECF registration and Admissions (sent via USPS) (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated. (Wittenberg, Christa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DePuy Synthes Sales Incorporated from Brown County Circuit Court, Case Number: 21-CV-1150 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3977191) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wittenberg, Christa)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST BEND MUTUAL INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GHI Insurance Company is a litigant