This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:59:52 (UTC).

Wesolek v. Pacific Hunt Energy Corp

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Wesolek filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Pacific Hunt Energy Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter Bray and Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02537

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peter Bray

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert C Wesolek

Defendant

Pacific Hunt Energy Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Christian Frederiksen, Jr

Attorney at Frederiksen Law PLLC

3710 Rawlins, Ste 1300

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorney

Robert E Sheeder

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

1717 Main St., Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPLY in Support of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp. (Sheeder, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#10

(#10) EMAIL MOTION for Extension of Time File a Reply( Motion Docket Date 9/30/2020.), MOTION to Strike #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp, filed. (jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#9

(#9) Amended RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Robert C Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Partial Dismiss)(Bernstein, Craig) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order Order on Pacific Hunt Energy Corporations Partial Motion to Dismi

#8

(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Robert C Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Pacific Hunt Energy Corporations Partial Motion to Dismiss)(Bernstein, Craig) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Affidavit Attachment A

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order)(Sheeder, Robert) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#5

(#5) General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. The initial conference set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes is cancelled. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Frederiksen, Charles) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A-L

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24943006) filed by Robert C Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-L)(Frederiksen, Charles) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY in Support of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp. (Sheeder, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #10 MOTION for Extension of Time File a Reply MOTION to Strike #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheeder, Robert) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EMAIL MOTION for Extension of Time File a Reply( Motion Docket Date 9/30/2020.), MOTION to Strike #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp, filed. (jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Amended RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Robert C Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Partial Dismiss)(Bernstein, Craig) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Robert C Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Pacific Hunt Energy Corporations Partial Motion to Dismiss)(Bernstein, Craig) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order)(Sheeder, Robert) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. The initial conference set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes is cancelled. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Frederiksen, Charles) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24943006) filed by Robert C Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-L)(Frederiksen, Charles) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less