This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2021 at 10:34:48 (UTC).

Weserve Access, LLC v. Birch Grove Software, Inc. d/b/a ActivTrak

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Weserve Access, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Birch Grove Software, Inc d/b/a ActivTrak. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00238

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Weserve Access, LLC

Defendant

Birch Grove Software, Inc. doing business as ActivTrak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Wittenzellner

Attorney at Williams Simons and Landis PLLC

327 Congress Avenue, Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Jonathan L. Hardt

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

327 Congress Ave., Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Michael Simons

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

327 Congress Ave., Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Fred I. Williams

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

327 Congress Ave., Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

M. Craig Tyler

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 W. 2Nd Street, Suite 1900

Austin, TX 78701

Janice L. Ta

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 W 2Nd St 1900

Austin, TX 78701

Dakota Kanetzky

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 W 2Nd Street Suite 1900

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Birch Grove Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tyler, M.) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Birch Grove Software, Inc. answer due 5/2/2021. (bw) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Birch Grove Software, Inc. d/b/a ActivTrak to answer or otherwise respond is extended until and including May 2, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Birch Grove Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tyler, M.) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dakota Kanetzky on behalf of Birch Grove Software, Inc.. Attorney Dakota Kanetzky added to party Birch Grove Software, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kanetzky, Dakota) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janice L. Ta on behalf of Birch Grove Software, Inc.. Attorney Janice L. Ta added to party Birch Grove Software, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Craig Tyler on behalf of Birch Grove Software, Inc.. Attorney M. Craig Tyler added to party Birch Grove Software, Inc.(pty:dft) (Tyler, M.) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Birch Grove Software, Inc. d/b/a ActivTrak. (am) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (am) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Weserve Access, LLC. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Weserve Access, LLC. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14575734), filed by Weserve Access, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janice Ta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M. Craig Tyler