This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 09:49:22 (UTC).

Wesel v. Berrien County et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Wesel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Berrien County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Phillip J. Green. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00663

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Wesel

Defendants

Berrien County

Kevin Higgs

Angela Baggett

Devonte Hureskin

Nicholis Vonkoenig

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy J. DeRouin

Attorney at Christopher Trainor & Associates

9750 Highland Rd.

White Lake, MI 48386

Christopher James Trainor

Attorney at Christopher Trainor & Associates

9750 Highland Rd.

White Lake, MI 48386

Defendant Attorneys

James T. McGovern

Attorney at Straub Seaman & Allen PC (St Joseph)

1014 Main St., P.O. Box 318

St. Joseph, MI 49085

James M. Straub

Attorney at Straub Seaman & Allen PC (St Joseph)

1014 Main St., P.O. Box 318

St. Joseph, MI 49085

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Angela Wesel re #8 [Attorney Amy J. DeRouin added to party Angela Wesel(pty:pla)] (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS returned executed; Angela Baggett served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS returned executed; Devonte Hureskin served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/19/2021 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 10/12/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to complaint #1 Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Angela Baggett, Berrien County, Kevin Higgs, Devonte Hureskin, Nicholis Vonkoenig (McGovern, James) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Berrien County served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Nicholis Vonkoenig served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Kevin Higgs served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021 (DeRouin, Amy) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James M. Straub on behalf of defendants Angela Baggett, Berrien County, Kevin Higgs, Devonte Hureskin, Nicholis Vonkoenig (Straub, James) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James T. McGovern on behalf of defendants Angela Baggett, Berrien County, Kevin Higgs, Devonte Hureskin, Nicholis Vonkoenig (McGovern, James) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Angela Baggett, Berrien County, Kevin Higgs, Devonte Hureskin, Nicholis Vonkoenig (pjw) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (pjw) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Angela Wesel in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6505889 (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Angela Baggett, Berrien County, Kevin Higgs, Devonte Hureskin, Nicholis Vonkoenig filed by Angela Wesel (Trainor, Christopher) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Berrien, County of is a litigant