This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2019 at 07:48:38 (UTC).

Wesco Insurance Company v. Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 Wesco Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00332

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wesco Insurance Company

Defendants

Wilder Arboleda

Joseph Molina Flynn

Gary Berdugo

Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation

UMB Bank, N.A.

Herman Yip

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Zizik

Attorney at Sulloway & Hollis, PLLC

40 Westminster St., Suite 201

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorneys

William M. Dolan, III

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Floor, 274-7200, Fax: 351-4607

Providence, RI 02903

William K. Wray, Jr.

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

William E. O'Gara

Attorney at PANNONE LOPES DEVEREAUX & O'GARA LLC

1301 Atwood Avenue, Suite 215 N, 824-5100, Fax: 824-5123

Johnston, RI 02919

Brian J. Lamoureux

Attorney at Pannone Lopes Devereaux & O'Gara LLC

1301 Atwood Avenue, Suite 215 N, 824-5100, Fax: 824-5123

Johnston, RI 02919

Robert M. Duffy

Attorney at Duffy & Sweeney, Ltd.

321 South Main Street, 4Th Floor, 455-0700, Fax: 455-0701

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. UMB Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Zizik, David) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#12

(#12) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to UMB Bank NA as Trustee on 7/11/19 by Wesco Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 8/12/2019. (Zizik, David) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Dolan, III on behalf of Wilder Arboleda, Gary Berdugo, Joseph Molina Flynn, Herman Yip (Dolan, William) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by William K. Wray, Jr. on behalf of Wilder Arboleda, Gary Berdugo, Joseph Molina Flynn, Herman Yip (Wray, William) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint filed by Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation. Responses due by 8/7/2019. (Lamoureux, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Duffy on behalf of UMB Bank, N.A. (Duffy, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Zizik, David) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William E. O'Gara on behalf of Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation (O'Gara, William) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Lamoureux on behalf of Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation (Lamoureux, Brian) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wesco Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for Wesco Insurance Company.. (Zizik, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1383700 ), filed by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Zizik, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines: Wilder Arboleda answer due 10/10/2019; Gary Berdugo answer due 10/10/2019; Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation answer due 10/10/2019; Joseph Molina Flynn answer due 10/10/2019; UMB Bank, N.A. answer due 10/10/2019; Herman Yip answer due 10/10/2019 - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/13/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. UMB Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Zizik, David) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to UMB Bank NA as Trustee on 7/11/19 by Wesco Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 8/12/2019. (Zizik, David) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Dolan, III on behalf of Wilder Arboleda, Gary Berdugo, Joseph Molina Flynn, Herman Yip (Dolan, William) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by William K. Wray, Jr. on behalf of Wilder Arboleda, Gary Berdugo, Joseph Molina Flynn, Herman Yip (Wray, William) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint filed by Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation. Responses due by 8/7/2019. (Lamoureux, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Duffy on behalf of UMB Bank, N.A. (Duffy, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesco Insurance Company. Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Zizik, David) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William E. O'Gara on behalf of Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation (O'Gara, William) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Lamoureux on behalf of Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation (Lamoureux, Brian) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Central Falls Detention Facility Corporation. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 19-cv-182 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wesco Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for Wesco Insurance Company.. (Zizik, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1383700 ), filed by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Zizik, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wesco Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for Wesco Insurance Company.. (Zizik, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1383700 ), filed by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Zizik, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.