This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2020 at 08:36:20 (UTC).

Werner v. Mirror Media Fund, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 Werner filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Mirror Media Fund, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sandra J. Feuerstein and Anne Y. Shields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01604

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sandra J. Feuerstein

Referral Judge

Anne Y. Shields

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffery R. Werner

Defendants

Does 1-5

Mirror Media Fund, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David B. Picker

Attorney at Spector, Gadon & Rosen, P.C.

1635 Market Street, 7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Bruce William Bellingham

Attorney at Spector Gadon & Rosen, P.C.

1635 Market Street, 7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Scheduling Conference served on Mirror Media Fund, Inc. on April 22, 2020, filed by Jeffery R. Werner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Bellingham, Bruce) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#6

(#6) Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Mirror Media Fund, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

1 #10

Exhibit 8

1 #9

Exhibit 7

1 #8

Exhibit 6

1 #7

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) NOTICE by Jeffery R. Werner re #1 Complaint, Form AO 121 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT (Bellingham, Bruce) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Scheduling Conference served on Mirror Media Fund, Inc. on April 22, 2020, filed by Jeffery R. Werner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Bellingham, Bruce) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Order upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 3/31/2020. (Disbrow, Sandra) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Mirror Media Fund, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketIncorrect Document Entry Information. Defendant was added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendant. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketFILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-12606649 (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1-5, Mirror Media Fund, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Jeffery R. Werner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8) (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Jeffery R. Werner re #1 Complaint, Form AO 121 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT (Bellingham, Bruce) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B. Picker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce William Bellingham