This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 07:40:53 (UTC).

Wepay Global Payments LLC v. PNC Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Wepay Global Payments LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against PNC Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05052

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wepay Global Payments LLC

Defendants

PNC Bank, National Association Member FDIC

PNC Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Michael Wawrzyn

Attorney at Wawrzyn LLC

200 East Randolph Streetsuite 5100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

#2

#3

#4

(#4) MAILED PATENT report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (txl, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Wepay Global Payments LLC regarding Complaint and Summons to PNC Bank, N.A. served on Quincy Rochester on 10/12/2021 (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Wepay Global Payments LLC. PNC Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Wepay Global Payments LLC. PNC Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Wepay Global Payments LLC regarding Complaint and Summons to PNC Bank, N.A. served on Quincy Rochester on 10/12/2021 (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (ak, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAILED PATENT report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (txl, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wepay Global Payments LLC by Matthew Michael Wawrzyn (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wepay Global Payments LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18700251. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew M. Wawrzyn