This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:18:18 (UTC).

Wenzel v. Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 Wenzel filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Cantor Fitzgerald Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03753

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Wenzel

Defendant

Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard Todd Schragin

Attorney at Sapir Schragin LLP

399 Knollwood Road, Suite 310

White Plains, NY 10603

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/26/2020) (ks) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schragin, Howard) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19834968)Document filed by Eric Wenzel..(Schragin, Howard) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard Todd Schragin