This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:04:40 (UTC).

Wensley v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Wensley filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midland Credit Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06883

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Wensley

Defendant

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Barshay

Attorney at Barshay Sanders, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Craig B. Sanders

Attorney at Barshay Sanders, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Jitesh Dudani

Attorney at Barshay Sanders PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Ste 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Stephen Jay Steinlight

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12134584 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Paul Wensley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Paul Wensley (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Stay pursuant to the FAA by Paul Wensley. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#12

(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Paul Wensley (Barshay, David) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#10

(#10) Letter Regarding Claims and Defenses by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Steinlight, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul Wensley. Midland Credit Management, Inc. waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jitesh Dudani on behalf of Paul Wensley (aty to be noticed) (Dudani, Jitesh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 1/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/13/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Jay Steinlight on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Steinlight, Stephen) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Steinlight, Stephen) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay pending arbitration. The case is stayed and will be marked administratively closed subject to reopening at the request of any party within 60 days of any final arbitration award. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/28/2020. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Stay pursuant to the FAA by Paul Wensley. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held on 1/27/2020 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Counsel for both sides appeared. By 2/3/2020, defendant shall file its motion to compel arbitration. Discovery stayed sine die. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Paul Wensley (Barshay, David) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jitesh Dudani on behalf of Paul Wensley (aty to be noticed) (Dudani, Jitesh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: The time of the Initial Conference previously set for 1/27/2020 at 10:30 AM is reset to 4:45 PM in Chambers 704S . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/24/2020. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter Regarding Claims and Defenses by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Steinlight, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Steinlight, Stephen) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Jay Steinlight on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Steinlight, Stephen) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul Wensley. Midland Credit Management, Inc. waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 1/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/13/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Paul Wensley (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12134584 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Paul Wensley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less