This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 08:26:38 (UTC).

Wendt et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Wendt filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel D. Crabtree and Angel D. Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02432

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Crabtree

Referral Judge

Angel D. Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandon Wendt

Summer Wendt

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Wal-Mart Stores Inc.,

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J'Nan C. Kimak

Attorney at Humphrey, Farrington & McClain

221 West Lexington, Suite 400

Independence, MO 64050

Timothy J. Kingsbury

Attorney at Humphrey, Farrington & McClain

221 West Lexington, Suite 400

Independence, MO 64050

Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell E. Wood

Attorney at Halbrook Wood, PC

3500 West 75Th Street, Suite 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Ian M. Gore

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Seattle

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98101

Neal S. Manne

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Weston Lee O'Black

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Matthew Miguel Peters

Attorney at Halbrook Wood, PC

3500 West 75Th Street, Suite 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Lindsay Poehling Windham

Attorney at Halbrook Wood, PC

3500 West 75Th Street, Suite 300

Prairie Village, KS 66208

 

Court Documents

#21

20 #1

Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF KENNETH B. McCLAIN

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

10 #3

Affidavit in Support of Motion and PHV E-filing Registration Form re Ian M. Gor

10 #2

Affidavit in Support of Motion and PHV E-filing Registration Form re Weston L.

10 #1

Affidavit in Support of Motion and PHV E-filing Registration Form re Neal S. Ma

#10

#7

5 #2

ECF Registration Form PHV Registration Form

5 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear PHV

#5

#3

#2

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #20 by Plaintiffs Brandon Wendt, Summer Wendt(Kimak, J'Nan) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for attorney KENNETH B. MCCLAIN to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5308627.) by Plaintiffs Brandon Wendt, Summer Wendt (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF KENNETH B. McCLAIN)(Kimak, J'Nan) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/27/2020. (hw) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Rule 26 Disclosures by Brandon Wendt, Summer Wendt. (Kimak, J'Nan) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures, Defendants' First Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions to Plaintiffs by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.,. (Windham, Lindsay) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 at 11:00 AM via Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 10/13/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/27/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/2/2020. (ht) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice and the affidavits in support, for good cause shown, the court finds that the motion should be granted and that Neal S. Manne, Weston Lee O'Black, Ian M. Gore should be and hereby are admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the District of Kansas for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Summer Wendt, Brandon Wendt upon Wal-Mart Stores Inc., served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020 (Kimak, J'Nan) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Summer Wendt, Brandon Wendt upon Wal-Mart Stores East, LP served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020 (Kimak, J'Nan) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., identifying Walmart Inc. as corporate parent for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Windham, Lindsay) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Poehling Windham on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., (Windham, Lindsay) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy J. Kingsbury for Brandon Wendt and Summer Wendt pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Entered by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/9/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for attorney Timothy J Kingsbury to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5250185.) by Plaintiffs Brandon Wendt, Summer Wendt (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear PHV, #2 ECF Registration Form PHV Registration Form)(Kimak, J'Nan) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 9/4/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Brandon Wendt, Summer Wendt - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kimak, J'Nan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Brandon Wendt, Summer Wendt. (Kimak, J'Nan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5248127.), filed by Summer Wendt, Brandon Wendt.(Kimak, J'Nan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weston Lee O'Black

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian M. Gore(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell E. Wood