This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2021 at 08:18:44 (UTC).

Wells v. SharkNinja Operating LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Wells filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SharkNinja Operating LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03021

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ethan Wells

Defendants

Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.

SharkNinja Operating LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Lawrence Hilton

Attorney at Hilton Parker LLC

10400 Blacklick-Eastern Rd Nw, Suite 110

Pickerington, OH 43147

Defendant Attorneys

Russell W Porritt

3230 Central Park West Dr., Suite 200

Toledo, OH 43617

Andrew J. Stough

3211 Central Park West, Suite 108

Toledo, OH 43617

Scott D. Kaiser

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Stough, Andrew) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#9

(#9) Notice of Deficiency re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott D. Kaiser. The filing fee was not submitted with the motion. The fee can be paid #online. Please scroll down to the event called, Pay Fees Via Pay.gov to pay the required fee.Deficiency Deadline by 8/3/2021. (er) Modified on 7/21/2021 to correct text and add document link to PHV motion (kk2) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Scott D. Kaiser by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Stough, Andrew) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Stough for Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Stough, Andrew) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell W Porritt for Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Porritt, Russell) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. & SharkNinja Operating LLC. (er) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Stough, Andrew) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott D. Kaiser as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/26/21. (sem) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketFiling fee received $ 200.00, receipt number 0066544 for the phv application of Scott Kaiser. (sem) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Deficiency re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott D. Kaiser. The filing fee was not submitted with the motion. The fee can be paid #online. Please scroll down to the event called, Pay Fees Via Pay.gov to pay the required fee.Deficiency Deadline by 8/3/2021. (er) Modified on 7/21/2021 to correct text and add document link to PHV motion (kk2) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Scott D. Kaiser by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Stough, Andrew) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTATION ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. answer due 7/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/22/21. (jr) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 7/26/2021. by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Stough, Andrew) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Stough for Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Stough, Andrew) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell W Porritt for Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Porritt, Russell) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. & SharkNinja Operating LLC. (er) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8340870), filed by ETHAN WELLS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Hilton, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SharkNinja Operating LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES INC. DBA DBA: A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA KOHL'S INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KOHL'S SEAL BEACH STORE 10604 DBA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS A PUBLIC ENTITY UNDER LAWS OF AND IN T is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Lawrence Hilton