This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2019 at 08:48:46 (UTC).

Wells v. Montgomery County Jail et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 Wells filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Montgomery County Jail. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Russ Walker and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00590

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan Russ Walker

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dedrick Lashon Wells

Wetumpka, AL 36092

Defendants

Montgomery County Jail

Derrick Cunningham

Ladarrian Bennett

Montgomery, AL 36117

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anil Ashok Mujumdar

Attorney at Zarzaur Mujumdar & Debrosse

2332 2Nd Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas T. Gallion, III

Attorney at Haskell Slaughter Gallion & Walker, LLC

242 Winton Blount Loop

Montgomery, AL 36117

Constance Caldwell Walker

Attorney at Haskell Slaughter Gallion & Walker LLC

242 Winton Blount Loop

Montgomery, AL 36117

 

Court Documents

#62

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

#55

#54

#53

#52

#51

#49

#48

#47

#46

#45

#44

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) TEXT ORDER granting #62 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/8/2019. (No PDF attached to this entry)(amf, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) (Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time) MOTION for Extension of Deadline re #61 Order, by Dedrick Lashon Wells. (Mujumdar, Anil) Modified on 10/7/2019 clarify text (cnw, ). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) BRIEFING ORDER it is ORDERED that the #54 motion be submitted without oral argument on 10/15/2019; further setting out other briefing requirements, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/17/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dedrick Lashon Wells. Ladarrian Bennett waiver sent on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Mujumdar, Anil) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF: it is ORDERED that: 1) Anil Ashok Mujumdar is APPOINTED to represent Plaintiff in this action. 2) This case henceforth proceed in the same manner as a regular civil rights action. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/10/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Derrick Cunningham, Montgomery County Jail. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Pursuant to the #58 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement - Attorney Thomas T. Gallion, III for Montgomery County Jail added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Montgomery County Jail. (Walker, Constance) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Pursuant to the #30 Notice of Appearance - Attorney Thomas T. Gallion, III for Derrick Cunningham added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Case transferred in from Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 7:19-cv-00841-RDP. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed in ALND, by Dedrick LashonWells. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of filing, entered by ALND: letter requesting IFP by Dedrick Lashon Wells. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER, entered by ALND - Notice of Deficient Pleading - plaintiff must file a verified application to proceed ifp within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/4/2018. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-00443. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk.(dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/1/2018.] (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: On May 7, 2018, the Magistrate Judge filed a Recommendation to which no timely objections have been filed. (Doc. #3 ) Upon an independent review of the record and upon consideration of the Recommendation, it is ORDERED that the Recommendation is ADOPTED and that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/1/2018.](cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NO OBJECTIONS filed to #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/1/2018.]. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1404. Objections to R&R due by 5/21/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/7/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/1/2018.]. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Dedrick Lashon Wells. (beh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/1/2018.]. (cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Doctor Anglea, Doctor Blend, Doctor Cooper, Doctor Glenn, Mental Health, Montgomery County Jail, Montgomery, Alabama, Doctor Purnee, Doctor Sing, State of Alabama, filed by Dedrick Lashon Wells.(beh,) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 6/1/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)(cnw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anil A Mujumdar