This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2021 at 07:17:30 (UTC).

Wells v. Great West Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Wells filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Great West Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin J. Cauthron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00870

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin J. Cauthron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Debbie Wells

Ashley Prieto

Defendants

Great West Casualty Company

Pinch Flatbed Inc

Curtis Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danielle P Daniel

Attorney at Colbert Cooper Hill

415 Nw 11Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Defendant Attorneys

Mehry Taremi

Attorney at Miller Johnson Jones Antonisse & White

500 Nw 6Th St, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Daniel K Jones

Attorney at Miller Johnson Jones Antonisse & White

500 Nw 6Th St, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Pinch Flatbed Inc.(Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Pinch Flatbed Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer within 7 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 10/19/21. (wh) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Pinch Flatbed Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Pinch Flatbed Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTIES. Ashley Prieto, Special Administrator of the Estate of Debbie Welles added. Debbie Wells terminated. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 10/01/21. (wh) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE (other) by Pinch Flatbed Inc and Plaintiff (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Substitute Party by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Suggestion of Death, #2 Exhibit Petition for Appointment of Special Administrator, #3 Exhibit Order Appointing Special Administrator, #4 Exhibit Letters of Special Administration)(Daniel, Danielle) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Great West Casualty Company for Failure to State a Claim by Pinch Flatbed Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3756095. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Debbie Wells by Pinch Flatbed Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Pinch Flatbed Inc (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Pinch Flatbed Inc (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of McClain County, case number CJ-20-190 filed by Pinch Flatbed Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petiton, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA Daniels, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel K Jones