This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:31:54 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al v. Arianna Ani Zadourian

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Arianna Ani Zadourian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and John F. Walter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07512

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Petitioner

Arianna Ani Zadourian

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Petitioners

Manuk Akopyan

Arianna Ani Zadourian

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Manuk Akopyan

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Christopher J McNamara

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

345 California Street Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94104-2670

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Yuval Mordechai Rogson

Attorney at Baker and Associates

1875 Century Park East Suite 1490

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jason T Riddick

Attorney at Baker and Associates, A.P.C.

1875 Century Park East, Suite 1490

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Scott L Baker

Attorney at Baker and Associates

1875 Century Park East Suite 1490

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant and counter-claimant Arianna Ani Zadourian, identifying WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., ARIANNA ANI ZADOURIAN, MANUKAKOPYAN, M&A Lifestyle, Inc., Mara Lifestyle, Inc., Pure C, Inc.. (Baker, Scott) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with L.R 7-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#13

(#13) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 23, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 9, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 for Interpleader filed by Defendant and Cross Complainant Arianna Ani Zadourian.(Baker, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Arianna Ani Zadourian answer now due 10/14/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Arianna Ani Zadourian.(Attorney Scott L Baker added to party Arianna Ani Zadourian(pty:dft))(Baker, Scott) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#10

(#10) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., upon Defendant Arianna Ani Zadourian served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., upon Defendant Manuk Akopyan acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Aren Debarseghian, Attorney. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Manuk Akopyan and Arianna Ani Zadourian. (jtil) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo & Company. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27702636 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Christopher J McNamara added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:pla))(McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant and counter-claimant Arianna Ani Zadourian, identifying WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., ARIANNA ANI ZADOURIAN, MANUKAKOPYAN, M&A Lifestyle, Inc., Mara Lifestyle, Inc., Pure C, Inc.. (Baker, Scott) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with L.R 7-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCROSSCLAIM against Cross-Defendant Manuk Akopyan, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Cross-Claimant Arianna Ani Zadourian. (iv) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 23, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 9, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 for Interpleader filed by Defendant and Cross Complainant Arianna Ani Zadourian.(Baker, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Arianna Ani Zadourian answer now due 10/14/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Arianna Ani Zadourian.(Attorney Scott L Baker added to party Arianna Ani Zadourian(pty:dft))(Baker, Scott) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., upon Defendant Arianna Ani Zadourian served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., upon Defendant Manuk Akopyan acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Aren Debarseghian, Attorney. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Manuk Akopyan and Arianna Ani Zadourian. (jtil) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo & Company. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27702636 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Christopher J McNamara added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:pla))(McNamara, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less