This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2019 at 07:38:48 (UTC).

Well Master Corporation v. LuckyShot LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 Well Master Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LuckyShot LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott T. Varholak and Christine M. Arguello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01617

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

well master corporation

16201 Table Mountain Parkway, Suite 100

Golden, CO 80403

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Shane Allen Fazzi

LuckyShot CNC LLC

LuckyShot LLC

524 23 Road

Grand Junction, CO 81507

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Claimant

LuckyShot LLC

524 23 Road

Grand Junction, CO 81507

3Rd Party Defendants

Andrew Blood

James Cole

Runnit CNC Shop, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Benjamin B. Lieb

Attorney at Talus Law Group LLC

2816 South Adams Street

Denver, CO 80210

Defendant, Counter Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Michael Wegener

Attorney at Wegener Scarborough Younge & Hockensmith LLP

743 Horizon Court, Suite 200

Grand Junction, CO 81506

Lorne Grant Hiller

Attorney at Wegener Scarborough Younge & Hockensmith LLP

743 Horizon Court, Suite 200

Grand Junction, CO 81506

John R. Posthumus

Attorney at Polsinelli PC-Denver

1401 Lawrence Street, Suite 2300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendants Shane Allen Fazzi, LuckyShot CNC LLC, LuckyShot LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff LuckyShot LLC. (Wegener, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#23

(#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LuckyShot CNC LLC, LuckyShot LLC, Shane Allen Fazzi. Runnit CNC Shop, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Hiller, Lorne) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#22

(#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LuckyShot CNC LLC, LuckyShot LLC, Shane Allen Fazzi. James Cole served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Hiller, Lorne) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#21

(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LuckyShot CNC LLC, LuckyShot LLC, Shane Allen Fazzi. Andrew Blood served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Hiller, Lorne) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

20 #3

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

20 #2

Summons as to Runnit CNC Shop, Inc.

20 #1

Summons as to Andrew Blood

#20

(#20) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. as to James Cole (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Andrew Blood, #2 Summons as to Runnit CNC Shop, Inc., #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

13 #5

Summons to Runnit CNC Shop, Inc.

1 #9

Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 4

1 #8

Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 3

1 #6

Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 1

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Summons - LuckyShot LLC

1 #3

Summons Summons - LuckyShot CNC LLC

1 #2

Summons Summons - S. Fazzi

1 #1

Corporate Disclosure Statement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6727209) Attorney Benjamin B. Lieb added to party well master corporation(pty:pla), filed by well master corporation. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Summons - S. Fazzi, #3 Summons - LuckyShot CNC LLC, #4 Summons - LuckyShot LLC, #5 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4)(Lieb, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Continue. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2019 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 9/25/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 9/18/2019. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LPtR 3(c), by 9/15/2019, the parties shall submit an agreed proposed protective order; or if they cannot agree, each party shall submit a separate proposed protective order which specifically identifies the provisions on which the parties agree and disagree. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/2/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Defendants' and Third-Party Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/1/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendants Shane Allen Fazzi, LuckyShot CNC LLC, LuckyShot LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff LuckyShot LLC. (Wegener, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LuckyShot CNC LLC, LuckyShot LLC, Shane Allen Fazzi. Runnit CNC Shop, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Hiller, Lorne) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LuckyShot CNC LLC, LuckyShot LLC, Shane Allen Fazzi. James Cole served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Hiller, Lorne) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LuckyShot CNC LLC, LuckyShot LLC, Shane Allen Fazzi. Andrew Blood served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Hiller, Lorne) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. as to James Cole (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Andrew Blood, #2 Summons as to Runnit CNC Shop, Inc., #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Andrew Blood re #13 Third Party Complaint, by ThirdParty Plaintiff LuckyShot LLC. (Wegener, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS REQUEST as to James Cole re #13 Third Party Complaint, by ThirdParty Plaintiff LuckyShot LLC. (Wegener, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Runnit CNC Shop, Inc. re #13 Third Party Complaint, by ThirdParty Plaintiff LuckyShot LLC. (Wegener, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/16/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/12/2019. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/12/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Well Master Corporation. Shane Allen Fazzi served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; LuckyShot CNC LLC served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; LuckyShot LLC served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - LuckyShot CNC LLC, #2 Affidavit of Service - Shane Allen Fazzi)(Lieb, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SHANE ALLEN FAZZI by Plaintiff Well Master Corporation. (Lieb, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - LUCKYSHOT LLC by Plaintiff Well Master Corporation. (Lieb, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - LUCKYSHOT CNC LLC by Plaintiff Well Master Corporation. (Lieb, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6727209) Attorney Benjamin B. Lieb added to party well master corporation(pty:pla), filed by well master corporation. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Summons - S. Fazzi, #3 Summons - LuckyShot CNC LLC, #4 Summons - LuckyShot LLC, #5 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4)(Lieb, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where well master corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John R. Posthumus

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lorne Grant Hiller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin M. Wegener