This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 11:21:12 (UTC).

Weldon-Dieckow v. Vanguard National Trailer Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Weldon-Dieckow filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Martin and Philip P Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00096

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E Martin

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kara W Weldon-Dieckow

Defendant

Vanguard National Trailer Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul A Logan

Attorney at John H Haskin & Associates LLC

255 N Alabama St 2Nd Fl

Indianapolis, IN 46204

John H Haskin

Attorney at John H Haskin & Associates LLC

255 N Alabama St 2Nd Fl

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer A Rulon

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - WC/OH

9277 Centre Pointe Dr Ste 300

West Chester, OH 45069

Heather L Wilson

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Ind/IN

201 N Illinois St Ste 1900, Po Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

#12

#13

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation.(Wilson, Heather) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2021 12:00 PM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/10/2021. (smb) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/10/2021. (smb) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #9 Vanguard National Trailer Corporation answer due February 18, 2021 (nae) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation ; answer due by February 18, 2021. (Rulon, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vanguard National Trailer Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CIMC USA Inc., Corporate Parent China International Marine Containers Group for Vanguard National Trailer Corporation.. (Rulon, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A Rulon on behalf of Vanguard National Trailer Corporation (Rulon, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L Wilson on behalf of Vanguard National Trailer Corporation (Wilson, Heather) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kara W Weldon-Dieckow. Vanguard National Trailer Corporation served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Haskin, John) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Vanguard National Trailer Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketJudge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE. (jat) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A Logan on behalf of Kara W Weldon-Dieckow (Logan, Paul) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John H Haskin on behalf of Kara W Weldon-Dieckow (Haskin, John) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Vanguard National Trailer Corporation( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4432407.), filed by Kara W Weldon-Dieckow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vanguard National Trailer Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer A Rulon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather L. Wilson