This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2020 at 10:28:22 (UTC).

Welch v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Welch filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew J. Kacsmaryk and Lee Ann Reno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00132

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew J. Kacsmaryk

Referral Judge

Lee Ann Reno

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Billy Lane Welch

Amarillo, TX 79107-9696

Respondent

Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) OBJECTION to #10 Findings and Recommendation. (daa) Copy of page 1 & 6 mailed in SASE on 7/14/2020 (daa). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#10

(#10) FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lane Welch. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/7/2020) (daa) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#8

(#8) SUPPLEMENT Brief in Support by Billy Lane Welch as to #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (daa) Modified on 6/30/2020 -- file-marked copy mailed to petitioner in SASE (awc). (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#7

(#7) BRIEFING ORDER: Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to file a pleading entitled "Response to the Court's Briefing Order" advising the Court why the instant federal habeas application should not be denied. Petitioner shall file his response within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. Failure to fully and timely comply with this Order will result in the immediate recommendation that this case be dismissed without further notification. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/24/2020) (daa) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER WITHDRAWING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION: On June 22, 2020, the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge entered findings, conclusions and a recommendation to the United States District Judge, recommending therein that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed by petitioner be dismissed for want of prosecution for failure to pay the $5.00 filing fee. On June 23, 2020, petitioner paid the $5.00 filing fee in this cause. Based upon the foregoing, this Court hereby WITHDRAWS its Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation to dismiss petitioner's habeas application. [ECF 5]. Motion terminated: #5 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lane Welch. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/23/2020) (daa) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#5

(#5) *W I T H D R A W N* See Dkt. #6 . FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lane Welch. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/22/2020) (daa) Modified text on 6/23/2020 (daa). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#3

(#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Billy Lane Welch. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nhp) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (nhp) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) OBJECTION to #10 Findings and Recommendation. (daa) Copy of page 1 & 6 mailed in SASE on 7/14/2020 (daa). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Tue Jul 7 14:48:28 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lane Welch. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/7/2020) (daa) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE filed by Billy Lane Welch re: #7 Briefing Order. (daa) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUPPLEMENT Brief in Support by Billy Lane Welch as to #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (daa) Modified on 6/30/2020 -- file-marked copy mailed to petitioner in SASE (awc). (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Jun 24 11:05:36 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEFING ORDER: Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to file a pleading entitled "Response to the Court's Briefing Order" advising the Court why the instant federal habeas application should not be denied. Petitioner shall file his response within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. Failure to fully and timely comply with this Order will result in the immediate recommendation that this case be dismissed without further notification. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/24/2020) (daa) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Jun 23 14:59:19 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER WITHDRAWING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION: On June 22, 2020, the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge entered findings, conclusions and a recommendation to the United States District Judge, recommending therein that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed by petitioner be dismissed for want of prosecution for failure to pay the $5.00 filing fee. On June 23, 2020, petitioner paid the $5.00 filing fee in this cause. Based upon the foregoing, this Court hereby WITHDRAWS its Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation to dismiss petitioner's habeas application. [ECF 5]. Motion terminated: #5 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lane Welch. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/23/2020) (daa) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Jun 22 12:43:38 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *W I T H D R A W N* See Dkt. #6 . FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lane Welch. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/22/2020) (daa) Modified text on 6/23/2020 (daa). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Tue May 26 15:45:08 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TEMPORARILY GRANTING PERMISSION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS PENDING SUPPLEMENTATION: Petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from the entry of this Order in which to submit the request and data sheet, pay the filing fee to the United States District Clerk, or submit evidence that petitioner has authorized the institution to disburse the requisite funds from his trust account. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/26/2020) (nhp) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. (Copy of 1st page of Petition also mailed to Petitioner) Fri May 22 11:21:38 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Billy Lane Welch. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nhp) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (nhp) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less