This case was last updated from PACER on 10/03/2021 at 06:58:46 (UTC).

Welch et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Welch filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00904

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Welch

Linda Welch

Defendants

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Brand Insulations, Inc.

A.W. Chesterton Company

North Coast Electric Company and Warren Pumps

Goulds Pumps, Inc. and ITT Corporation

IMO Industries Inc

Metalclad Insulation Corporation and Caterpillar, Inc.

P-G Industries, Inc.

BW/IP International Inc

Tate Andale, LLC and Haskell Corporation

Carrier Corporation

The William Powell Company

The Nash Engineering Company and Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc.

Pfizer, Inc.

Electrolux Home Products, Inc.; ViacomCBS, Inc.; Spirax Sarco, Inc. and General Electric

Flowserve US Inc.

Union Carbide Corporation

Atlantic Richfield Company; BP America, Inc.; BP Corporation of North America, Inc.; and BP Products North America, Inc.

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Phineas Bergman

Attorney at BERGMAN DRAPER OSLUND UDO

821 Second Ave Ste 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorneys

Richard G Gawlowski

Attorney at WILSON SMITH COCHRAN & DICKERSON

901 Fifth Ave, Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98164-2050

David A Shaw

Attorney at WILLIAMS KASTNER & GIBBS (SEA)

Two Union Square

601 Union St, STE 4100

Tyler J Hermsen

Attorney at WILLIAMS KASTNER & GIBBS (SEA)

Two Union Square

601 Union St, STE 4100

Laura E Kruse

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

Allen Eraut

Attorney at RIZZO MATTINGLY BOSWORTH PC

1300 Sw Sixth Ave, Ste 330

Portland, OR 97201

Shaun Mary Morgan

Attorney at RIZZO MATTINGLY BOSWORTH PC

1300 Sw Sixth Ave, Ste 330

Portland, OR 97201

Ronald C Gardner

Attorney at GARDNER TRABOLSI & ASSOC. PLLC

2200 Sixth Avenue, Ste 600

Seattle, WA 98121

Michael Edward Ricketts

Attorney at GORDON THOMAS HONEYWELL (SEA)

520 Pike St Ste 2350

Seattle, WA 98101

Karleen Joy Scharer

Attorney at BULLIVANT HOUSER BAILEY (SEA)

925 Fourth Ave Ste 3800

Seattle, WA 98104-1157

Katherine M. Steele

Attorney at BULLIVANT HOUSER BAILEY (SEA)

925 Fourth Ave Ste 3800

Seattle, WA 98104-1157

Diane Catherine Babbitt

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD (WA)

999 Third Ave Ste 3760

Seattle, WA 98104

Kyle A Jones

Attorney at DAVIS LAW GROUP

999 Third Ave Ste 3760

Seattle, WA 98104

Christine E Dinsdale

Attorney at SOHA & LANG PS

1325 Fourth Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98101-2570

Rachel A Rubin

Attorney at SOHA & LANG PS

1325 Fourth Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98101-2570

J. Scott Wood

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD (WA)

999 Third Ave Ste 3760

Seattle, WA 98104

Megan Uhle

Attorney at WILLIAMS KASTNER GREENE & MARKLEY

1515 Sw Fifth Ave, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97201

Nicole R. MacKenzie

Attorney at WILLIAMS KASTNER & GIBBS (SEA)

Two Union Square

601 Union St, STE 4100

Melissa K Roeder

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD (WA)

999 Third Ave Ste 3760

Seattle, WA 98104

James D Hicks

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD (WA)

999 Third Ave Ste 3760

Seattle, WA 98104

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#116

(#116) RECEIPT by King County Superior Court re #108 Order on Motion to Remand. (PM) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#115

(#115) NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani ; by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#114

(#114) LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court (PM) (cc: letter, remand order, docket sheet sent to King County Superior Court via USPS) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#113

(#113) DECLARATION of Mark Tuvim ISO Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation re #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#112

(#112) RESPONSE, by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation, to #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani. (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#108

(#108) ORDER REMANDING AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re Plaintiffs' #23 Motion to Remand. The Court GRANTS the #23 Motion, REMANDS this matter to King County Superior Court, and GRANTS Plaintiffs' request attorneys' fees and costs. Within seven days of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file the requested materials necessary for the Court to set the proper award of attorneys' fees and costs. And although the Court remands this matter, it will still consider and rule on Plaintiffs' #104 Motion for Sanctions, which notes on August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 8/24/2021. (PM) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

104 #1

Proposed Order

#104

(#108) ORDER REMANDING AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re Plaintiffs' #23 Motion to Remand. The Court GRANTS the #23 Motion, REMANDS this matter to King County Superior Court, and GRANTS Plaintiffs' request attorneys' fees and costs. Within seven days of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file the requested materials necessary for the Court to set the proper award of attorneys' fees and costs. And although the Court remands this matter, it will still consider and rule on Plaintiffs' #104 Motion for Sanctions, which notes on August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 8/24/2021. (PM) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

23 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint; by Warren Pumps LLC.(Eraut, Allen) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Colfax Corporation as no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Eraut, Allen) Modified on 7/9/2021 to reflect CP on docket (MET). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Eraut, Allen) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Phineas Bergman on behalf of Plaintiffs David Welch, Linda Welch. (Bergman, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund on behalf of Plaintiffs David Welch, Linda Welch. (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#3

(#3) PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe re Notice of Removal and Exhibit) by Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Craig on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corp.. (Craig, Kevin) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-07123-2; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7153476), filed by Velan Valve Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) RECEIPT by King County Superior Court re #108 Order on Motion to Remand. (PM) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Motion terminated: Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. No. #104 ) is hereby TERMINATED per Plaintiffs' Notice to Withdraw the Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. No. 115).(IJM) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani ; by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court (PM) (cc: letter, remand order, docket sheet sent to King County Superior Court via USPS) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) DECLARATION of Mark Tuvim ISO Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation re #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) RESPONSE, by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation, to #104 MOTION for Sanctions Against Mark Tuvim and Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani. (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES re #23 Motion for Remand; re #108 Order on Motion to Remand. The Court AWARDS $13,750 to Plaintiffs as the reasonable amount of attorneys' fees incurred in obtaining a remand of this matter after Velan Valve Corp. improperly removed it from King County Superior Court. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) DECLARATION of Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund Re: Attorneys Fees on Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch re #23 MOTION to Remand (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) DECLARATION of Matthew P. Bergman, Re: Attorney's Fees on Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch re #23 MOTION to Remand (Bergman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) ORDER REMANDING AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re Plaintiffs' #23 Motion to Remand. The Court GRANTS the #23 Motion, REMANDS this matter to King County Superior Court, and GRANTS Plaintiffs' request attorneys' fees and costs. Within seven days of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file the requested materials necessary for the Court to set the proper award of attorneys' fees and costs. And although the Court remands this matter, it will still consider and rule on Plaintiffs' #104 Motion for Sanctions, which notes on August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 8/24/2021. (PM) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint; by Warren Pumps LLC.(Eraut, Allen) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketJudge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SG) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Colfax Corporation as no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Eraut, Allen) Modified on 7/9/2021 to reflect CP on docket (MET). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Eraut, Allen) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Phineas Bergman on behalf of Plaintiffs David Welch, Linda Welch. (Bergman, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund on behalf of Plaintiffs David Welch, Linda Welch. (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe re Notice of Removal and Exhibit) by Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Craig on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corp.. (Craig, Kevin) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-07123-2; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7153476), filed by Velan Valve Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tuvim, Mark) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where North Coast Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases where P-G INDUSTRIES, INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PRYOR GIGGEY CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where BRAND INSULATIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant