This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2020 at 14:39:58 (UTC).

Welborne v. Kiss Auto Glass, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Welborne filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Kiss Auto Glass, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. McFarland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00421

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. McFarland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dustin Tyler Welborne

Defendants

Richard J. Kiss

Kiss Auto Glass, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christian A Jenkins

Attorney at Minnillo & Jenkins Co., LPA

2712 Observatory Avenue

Cincinnati, OH 45208

Robb S. Stokar

Attorney at Minnillo & Jenkins Co., LPA

2712 Observatory Avenue

Cincinnati, OH 45208

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kiss Auto Glass, Inc. on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Stokar, Robb) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Richard J. Kiss on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Stokar, Robb) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7479876), filed by Dustin Tyler Welborne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jenkins, Christian) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kiss Auto Glass, Inc. on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Stokar, Robb) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Richard J. Kiss on 6/3/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Stokar, Robb) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7479876), filed by Dustin Tyler Welborne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jenkins, Christian) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robb S. Stokar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian A Jenkins