This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2019 at 07:35:20 (UTC).

Welborn v. Parker et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Welborn filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Parker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerome T. Kearney and Brian S. Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00439

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerome T. Kearney

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnathan Welborn

Benton, AR 72015

Defendants

Teague

Aaron

Toya Parker

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT: Consistent with the #4 order entered on this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/14/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Jonathan Welborn's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/14/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Plaintiff to either submit the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry of this Order; directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Saline County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/26/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Johnathan Welborn.(kdr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnathan Welborn. (kdr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JUDGMENT: Consistent with the #4 order entered on this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/14/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Jonathan Welborn's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/14/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Plaintiff to either submit the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry of this Order; directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Saline County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/26/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Johnathan Welborn.(kdr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnathan Welborn. (kdr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teague is a litigant

Latest cases where AARON'S is a litigant