This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2022 at 07:51:13 (UTC).

WEISER v. ST. FRANCIS HEALTH, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 WEISER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ST FRANCIS HEALTH, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEATHER WEISER

Defendant

ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARBARA H AGRICOLA

Defendant Attorney

BENSON EDWARD POPE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ST. FRANCIS HEALTH, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3977985, $402 filed by HEATHER WEISER (Attachments: #1 Summons St. Francis Health, LLC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(AGRICOLA, BARBARA) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

1 #1

Summons St. Francis Health, LLC

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons issued as to ST FRANCIS HEALTH, LLC (tlf). (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BENSON EDWARD POPE on behalf of ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC Attorney BENSON EDWARD POPE added to party ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC(pty:dft)(POPE, BENSON) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#4

(#4) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC filed by BENSON EDWARD POPE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(POPE, BENSON) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

4 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by March 4, 2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 2/17/2022 (blm) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC filed by BENSON EDWARD POPE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(POPE, BENSON) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BENSON EDWARD POPE on behalf of ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC Attorney BENSON EDWARD POPE added to party ST FRANCIS HEALTH LLC(pty:dft)(POPE, BENSON) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons issued as to ST FRANCIS HEALTH, LLC (tlf). (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by HEATHER WEISER; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager (tlf). (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ST. FRANCIS HEALTH, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3977985, $402 filed by HEATHER WEISER (Attachments: #1 Summons St. Francis Health, LLC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(AGRICOLA, BARBARA) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less