Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2021 at 07:30:35 (UTC).

Weirton Area Water Board et al v. Corteva, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Weirton Area Water Board filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Corteva, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01064

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Weirton

Weirton Area Water Board

Defendants

Dupont De Nemours Inc

Archroma U.S. Inc.

Dynax Corporation

AGC Chemicals Americas Inc

Solvay Specialty Polymers USA LLC

Corteva Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. Joseph Hrubiec

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik, LLC

919 North Market Street, Suite 1801

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:21-cv-00343. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#9

(#9) TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-49) in MDL No. 2873 In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Solvay USA LLC on March 16, 2021, filed by City of Weirton, Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dynax Corporation on March 22, 2021, filed by City of Weirton, Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on DuPont de Nemours Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Corteva Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Archroma US, Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on AGS Chemicals Americas Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Archroma U.S., Inc., City of Weirton, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3564573.) - filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#12) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Delaware, 1:21-cv-00343, Weirton Area Water Board et al v. Corteva Inc et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1064-RMG (sshe, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:21-cv-00343. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to District of South Carolina. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-49) in MDL No. 2873 In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Solvay USA LLC on March 16, 2021, filed by City of Weirton, Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dynax Corporation on March 22, 2021, filed by City of Weirton, Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on DuPont de Nemours Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Corteva Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Archroma US, Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on AGS Chemicals Americas Inc. on March 12, 2021, filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Archroma U.S., Inc., City of Weirton, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3564573.) - filed by Weirton Area Water Board. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/12/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Archroma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Solvay Specialty Polymers USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AGC Chemical Americas, Inc. is a litigant