This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2021 at 07:55:01 (UTC).

Weintraub et al. v. Great Northern Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Weintraub filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Great Northern Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07965

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Philip and Jamila Weintraub

Philip Weintraub

Jamila weintraub

Defendant

Great Northern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Scott Frydman

Attorney at Frydman LLC

501 Fifth Avenue 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Alexander Pearson McBride

Attorney at Frydman LLC

501 Fifth Avenue 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Eric D. Freed

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1900 Market Street, The Atrium- Third Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Stephen S. Kempa

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Paul Christopher Ferland

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

45 Broadway, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Philip Weintraub, Jamila weintraub..(Frydman, David) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#27

(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen S. Kempa on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company..(Kempa, Stephen) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

26 #2

Affidavit Affidavit of Jeffrey Pinto in Support of Defendant's Motion to Di

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric D. Freed on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company..(Freed, Eric) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Eric David Freed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED, that the plaintiff's motion to have Eric David Freed admitted to practice law in the Southern District of New York with respect to the instant lawsuit on a Pro Hac Vice basis be, and the same hereby is, in all respects GRANTED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/5/2021) (kv) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

22 #4

"Proposed Order"

22 #3

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

22 #1

Affirmation of Paul Ferland

22 #22

Main Document

8 #1

Memorandum of Law

8 #8

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Philip Weintraub, Jamila weintraub..(Frydman, David) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 11/12/2021 re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Plaintiffs surreply due November 19, 2021. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen S. Kempa on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company..(Kempa, Stephen) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Karen A. Moore in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeffrey Pinto in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint).(Ferland, Paul) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric D. Freed on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company..(Freed, Eric) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Eric David Freed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED, that the plaintiff's motion to have Eric David Freed admitted to practice law in the Southern District of New York with respect to the instant lawsuit on a Pro Hac Vice basis be, and the same hereby is, in all respects GRANTED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/5/2021) (kv) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. Oral Argument set for 11/12/2021 at 10:30 AM on defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim will be in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Eric David Freed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Stephen Stanley Kempa to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Stephen Stanley Kempa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED, that the plaintiff's motion to have Stephen Stanley Kempa admitted to practice law in the Southern District of New York with respect to the instant lawsuit on a Pro Hac Vice basis be, and the same hereby is, in all respects GRANTED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/1/2021) (kv) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Paul Christopher Ferland re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul Christopher Ferland. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Philip and Jamila Weintraub. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Christopher Ferland. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:0075; Citizenship Defendant code 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); Dollar Demand blank; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,500,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul Christopher Ferland. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Great Northern Insurance Company, Philip and Jamila Weintraub. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Pearson McBride on behalf of Philip and Jamila Weintraub..(McBride, Alexander) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Scott Frydman on behalf of Philip and Jamila Weintraub..(Frydman, David) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o CHUBB LIMITED for Great Northern Insurance Company. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company..(Ferland, Paul) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ferland, Paul) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Christopher Ferland on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company..(Ferland, Paul) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 655133/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25106648).Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Ferland, Paul) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Northern Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL FERLAND