This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:51:30 (UTC).

Weinstock v. Harvey et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Weinstock filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Harvey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony E. Porcelli and Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02979

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Weinstock

Defendants

jasen ladair harvey

Catharine M. Harvey

Jasen Ladair Harvey doing business as Harvey's Tax Service

Catharine M. Harvey doing business as Harvey's Tax Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Edwin Toombs

Attorney at James Toombs Law

Suite 300, 550 North Reo Street

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jasen Ladair Harvey (BES) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER: Plaintiff Catherine Weinstock's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Jasen Harvey (Doc. #10) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter an entry of default as to Defendant Jasen Harvey. Plaintiff Catherine Weinstock's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Catharine Harvey (Doc. #11) is DENIED. The Plaintiff is directed to file a status report with the Court as to its efforts to properly effect service of process on Catharine Harvey by February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/29/2020. (SGM) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit Affidavit

#11

(#11) MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Catharine M. Harvey by Catherine Weinstock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Toombs, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 01/23/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit Affidavit

#10

(#10) MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Jasen Ladair Harvey by Catherine Weinstock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Toombs, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying #8 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/23/2020. (SGM) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

8 #1

Exhibits A to E

#8

(#8) MOTION for default judgment against All Defendants by Catherine Weinstock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to E)(Toombs, James) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

7 #1

Affidavit of Process Server

#7

(#7) RETURN of service executed on 12/06/2019 by Catherine Weinstock as to Catharine M. Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Toombs, James) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

6 #1

Affidavit of Process Server

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on 12/23/2019 by Catherine Weinstock as to Jasen Ladair Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Toombs, James) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Catharine M. Harvey, Jasen Ladair Harvey. (BES) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/6/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/6/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jasen Ladair Harvey (BES) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Plaintiff Catherine Weinstock's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Jasen Harvey (Doc. #10) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter an entry of default as to Defendant Jasen Harvey. Plaintiff Catherine Weinstock's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Catharine Harvey (Doc. #11) is DENIED. The Plaintiff is directed to file a status report with the Court as to its efforts to properly effect service of process on Catharine Harvey by February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/29/2020. (SGM) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Catharine M. Harvey by Catherine Weinstock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Toombs, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Jasen Ladair Harvey by Catherine Weinstock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Toombs, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying #8 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/23/2020. (SGM) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for default judgment against All Defendants by Catherine Weinstock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to E)(Toombs, James) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of service executed on 12/06/2019 by Catherine Weinstock as to Catharine M. Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Toombs, James) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of service executed on 12/23/2019 by Catherine Weinstock as to Jasen Ladair Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Toombs, James) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Catharine M. Harvey, Jasen Ladair Harvey. (BES) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/6/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/6/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2979-T-33AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-16214931) filed by Catherine Weinstock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet , #3 Proposed Summons)(Toombs, James) Modified on 12/5/2019 to correct docket text (SJB). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less