This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:22:29 (UTC).

Weinhouse v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Property - Real Property Product Liability case was filed by Weinhouse against Monsanto Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-81182

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Weinhouse

Defendant

Monsanto Company

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (cds) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-157) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 2741 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11924558, filed by Steven Weinhouse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Petosa, Frank) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steven Weinhouse. Monsanto Company served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Petosa, Frank) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 9:19-cv-81182 electronically transferred out to California Northern. (mc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Terminated per DE #5 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-157) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 2741 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steven Weinhouse. Monsanto Company served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Petosa, Frank) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (cds) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11924558, filed by Steven Weinhouse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Petosa, Frank) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.