This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 08:41:39 (UTC).

Weinhold et al v. Garcias et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Weinhold filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Garcias. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Jared M. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-61821

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II

Referral Judge

Jared M. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steven Weinhold

Laura Weinhold

Defendants

ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Nisbany S Garcias

Nisbany Surit Garcias

Pompano Beach, FL 33069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel C. Jensen

Attorney at Lytal, Reiter, Smith Ivey & Fronrath, LLP

515 N. Flagler Drive, Suite 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Kevin Charles Smith

Attorney at Lytal Reiter Clark Fountain & Williams

515 N Flagler Drive, 10Th Floor Po Box 4056

West Palm Beach, FL 33402-4056

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos Manuel Llorente

Attorney at Law Offices Sanabria Llorente & Associates

1200 South Pine Island Road, Suite 725

Plantation, FL 33324

Anthony David Cutrona

Attorney at Law Offices of Sanabria, Llorente, Marsh and Associates

1200 South Pine Island Road, Suite 725

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nisbany Surit Garcias, ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by Laura Weinhold, Steven Weinhold.(kpe) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

27 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint

#27

(#27) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Laura Weinhold, Steven Weinhold. Responses due by 11/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#26

(#26) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Steven R. Jaffe. Mediation Hearing set for 4/1/2021 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kbm) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#25

(#25) Proposed NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Steven R Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/1/2021 at 10:00 am. (Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE by Steven R Jaffe Notice of Mediation. Attorney Steven R. Jaffe added to party Steven R Jaffe(pty:med). (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER REQUIRING MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT OR NOTICE OF JOINT LIABILITY. ( Responses due by 11/12/2020) Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #18 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Nisbany S Garcias per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Re: 19 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#18

(#20) ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #18 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Nisbany S Garcias per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Re: 19 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony David Cutrona on behalf of ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#5

(#5) First MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN COUNT XV OF COMPLAINT by ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 9/23/2020 (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Daniel C. Jensen, mailing date 09/09/2020, (cco) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Docket Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#5) First MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN COUNT XV OF COMPLAINT by ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 9/23/2020 (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nisbany Surit Garcias, ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by Laura Weinhold, Steven Weinhold.(kpe) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, attached to their Motion as Exhibit 1, is deemed filed as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/5/2020. (kbm) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Laura Weinhold, Steven Weinhold. Responses due by 11/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Steven R. Jaffe. Mediation Hearing set for 4/1/2021 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kbm) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Proposed NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Steven R Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/1/2021 at 10:00 am. (Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Clerks Notice to Filer re DE #22 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected. ERROR. The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE 23 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (lbc) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 4/1/21. SEE DE #22 for image. (lbc) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE by Steven R Jaffe Notice of Mediation. Attorney Steven R. Jaffe added to party Steven R Jaffe(pty:med). (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REQUIRING MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT OR NOTICE OF JOINT LIABILITY. ( Responses due by 11/12/2020) Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #18 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Nisbany S Garcias per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Re: 19 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Compliance with Courts Order Requiring Removal Status Report by ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMPLETE STATE COURT FILE, #2 Docket Sheet STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET) (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Charles Smith on behalf of Laura Weinhold, Steven Weinhold. Attorney Kevin Charles Smith added to party Laura Weinhold(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Charles Smith added to party Steven Weinhold(pty:pla). (Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Requiring Removal Status Report. Counsel for the removing party is directed to file and serve a Removal Status Report no later than September 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (kbm) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony David Cutrona on behalf of ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN COUNT XV OF COMPLAINT by ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 9/23/2020 (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Daniel C. Jensen, mailing date 09/09/2020, (cco) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13490229, filed by ILLINOIS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Foreign Profit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cutrona, Anthony) (No Answer or Motion to dismiss filed) Text Modified on 9/9/2020 (amb). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less