This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:25:45 (UTC).

Beryl Weiner et al v. Steadfast Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Beryl Weiner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Steadfast Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00122

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Beryl Weiner

S&W Health Management Services, Inc.

Sycamore Healthcare Services, LLC

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Steadfast Insurance Company

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

David M Friedman

Attorney at Striss Maher LLP

255 California Street Suite 1350

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michelle Lee Covington

Attorney at Stris and Maher LLP

255 California Street Suite 1350

San Francisco, CA 94111

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Jordon Edward Harriman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

15 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #10 filed by Plaintiffs S&W Health Management Services, Inc., Sycamore Healthcare Services, LLC, Beryl Weiner.(Friedman, David) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs S&W Health Management Services, Inc., Sycamore Healthcare Services, LLC, Beryl Weiner, (Covington, Michelle) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#12

(#12) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs S&W Health Management Services, Inc., Sycamore Healthcare Services, LLC, Beryl Weiner.. (Covington, Michelle) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

10 #7

Exhibit G

10 #6

Exhibit F

10 #5

Exhibit E

10 #4

Exhibit D

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) NOTICE Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company's Amended Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPLICATION for Discovery regarding Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company's Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. Application set for hearing on 4/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company's Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #10 filed by Plaintiffs S&W Health Management Services, Inc., Sycamore Healthcare Services, LLC, Beryl Weiner.(Friedman, David) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs S&W Health Management Services, Inc., Sycamore Healthcare Services, LLC, Beryl Weiner, (Covington, Michelle) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs S&W Health Management Services, Inc., Sycamore Healthcare Services, LLC, Beryl Weiner.. (Covington, Michelle) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company's Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company's Amended Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiffs Beryl Weiner, Sycamore Healthcare Services, LLC, and S&W Health Management Services, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/20/2021, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company, identifying Zurich American Insurance Company, et al.. (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Jordon E. Harriman in Support of Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company's Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 21SMCV01957 Receipt No: ACACDC-32580652 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Jordon Edward Harriman added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S&W HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordon Edward Harriman