This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2020 at 09:25:15 (UTC).

Beryl Weiner et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Beryl Weiner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and Virginia A. Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10664

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Roxbury Healthcare Services, LLC

S&W Health Management Services Inc

Mr. Beryl Weiner

S and W Health Management Services, Inc.

South Bay Hospital Management Company, LLC

Counter Defendant and Petitioner

South Bay Hospital Management Company, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

David M Friedman

Attorney at Oloza Fortney and Friedman LLP

255 California Street Suite 1350

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michelle Covington

Attorney at Ogloza Fortney and Friedman LLP

255 California Suite 1350

San Francisco, CA 94111

Micah D Nash

Attorney at Ogloza Fortney and Friedman LLP

255 California Street Suite 1360

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Valerie D Rojas

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendants Beryl Weiner, South Bay Hospital Management Company, LLC; Jury Demand, filed by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Rojas, Valerie) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Rojas, Valerie) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Scottsdale Insurance Company answer now due 2/13/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Attorney Valerie D Rojas added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Rojas, Valerie) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge George H. Wu, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:19-cv-00904 GW(PLAx) (rn) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint, #1 as to Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. (bm) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 filed by Plaintiffs Roxbury Healthcare Services, LLC, S and W Health Management Services, Inc., Beryl Weiner. (Friedman, David) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Friedman, David) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Roxbury Healthcare Services, LLC, S&W Health Management Services Inc, Beryl Weiner. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-00904-RSWL-PLA (Friedman, David) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Roxbury Healthcare Services, LLC, S&W Health Management Services Inc, Beryl Weiner. (Friedman, David) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24970583 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Beryl Weiner, S&W Health Management Services Inc, Roxbury Healthcare Services, LLC. (Attorney David M Friedman added to party Roxbury Healthcare Services, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David M Friedman added to party S&W Health Management Services Inc(pty:pla), Attorney David M Friedman added to party Beryl Weiner(pty:pla))(Friedman, David) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROXBURY HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant