This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2020 at 07:32:38 (UTC).

Weiman Products, LLC v. Aire-Master of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Weiman Products, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Aire-Master of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02937

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Weiman Products, LLC

Defendant

Aire-Master of America, Inc. doing business as Nuvera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph J. Berghammer

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

71 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60606

John Anglin Webb, Jr

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

10 S Wacker Dr., Suite #3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Katherine Laatsch Fink

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

71 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Laurie Ann Haynie

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

120 South Riverside Plaza, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

John Aron Carnahan

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

120 South Riverside Plaza, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

#8

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Second Request) (Dckt. No. #22 ) is hereby granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by August 3, 2020. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION by Defendant Aire-Master of America, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Second Request) (Carnahan, John) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Dckt. No. #19 ) is granted. Defendant shall file a response or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by July 13, 2020. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION by Defendant Aire-Master of America, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer of Otherwise Plead (Carnahan, John) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Disclosure STATEMENT by Aire-Master of America, Inc. and Notifications as to Affiliates (Carnahan, John) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aire-Master of America, Inc. by Laurie Ann Haynie (Haynie, Laurie) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aire-Master of America, Inc. by John Aron Carnahan (Carnahan, John) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certification that Voluntary Lanham Act Mediation Program Materials Were Provided to Weiman Products, LLC by Weiman Products, LLC (Webb, John) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Aire-Master of America, Inc. (ng, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 3.4 Statement by Weiman Products, LLC (Berghammer, Joseph) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Weiman Products, LLC (Berghammer, Joseph) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Weiman Products, LLC by John Anglin Webb, Jr (Webb, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Weiman Products, LLC by Katherine Laatsch Fink (Fink, Katherine) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Weiman Products, LLC by Joseph J. Berghammer (Berghammer, Joseph) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Berghammer, Joseph) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Weiman Products, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17021642. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Berghammer, Joseph) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weiman Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurie Ann Haynie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Aron Carnahan