This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 08:35:23 (UTC).

Leemanuel Weilch v. Noil USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 Leemanuel Weilch filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Noil USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03633

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEEMANUEL WEILCH

Defendants

HAITHAM BUNDAKJI

NOIL USA, INC.

Does 1 to 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason J Kim

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Jason T Yoon

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Declaration

9 #2

Declaration

#10

#11

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been resolved by a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #11 , hereby orders this action dismissed with prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. [Made JS-6. Case Terminated.] (et) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Leemanuel Weilch. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S UNRUH ACT CLAIM by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim. This claim is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff asserting it in state court. The Court retains jurisdiction over Plaintiff's ADA claim. (et) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Leemanuel Weilchto Order to Show Cause, #8 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Cormac J. Carney.The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause as to why it should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over his Unruh Act claim and other state law claims for similar reasons. Plaintiff shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause by May 18, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Haitham Bundakji, Noil USA, Inc. (et) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 LEEMANUEL WEILCH. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LEEMANUEL WEILCH. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26150642 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party LEEMANUEL WEILCH(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less