This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:42:22 (UTC).

Weigelt v. County Of Monterey et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Weigelt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against County Of Monterey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02687

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brian Weigelt

Salinas, CA 93901

Brian Stacey Weigelt

Salionas, CA 93901

Defendants

County Of Monterey

Monterey County District Attorney's Office

Monterey County Family Courts

Salinas Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Rohit Kodical

Attorney at California State Attorney General's Office

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor, P.O. Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

Ellen Sue Lyons

Attorney at County of Monterey

168 West Alisal Street, Third Floor

Salinas, CA 93901

Michael David Mutalipassi

Attorney at City of Salinas

200 Lincoln Avenue

Salinas, CA 93901

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#11

(#19) REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement [FRCP 12(b)(6), 12(e)] ) Monterey County District Attorney filed byBrian Stacey Weigelt. (Weigelt, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2019) (Entered: 06/30/2019)

25 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

11 #1

Declaration of Ellen S. Lyons

11 #3

Certificate/Proof of Service

#25

(#25) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mutalipassi, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

5 #2

Envelope

#13

(#20) REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss by State Court Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Superior Court of California, County of Monterey filed byBrian Stacey Weigelt. (Weigelt, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2019) (Entered: 06/30/2019)

#27

(#27) REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss by State Court Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byMonterey County Family Courts. (Kodical, Rohit) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #2

receipt

#2

(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Monterey County District Attorney's Office, Monterey County Family Courts, Salinas Police Department. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

11 #2

Proposed Order

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against County Of Monterey, Monterey County District Attorney's Office, Monterey County Family Courts, Salinas Police Department. Filed byBrian Weigelt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Weigelt. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#6) ORDER GRANTING Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing #5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Letter, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#26

(#26) REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement [FRCP 12(b)(6), 12(e)] ) filed by County Of Monterey, Monterey County District Attorney's Office. (Lyons, Ellen) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss by State Court Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byMonterey County Family Courts. (Kodical, Rohit) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement [FRCP 12(b)(6), 12(e)] ) filed by County Of Monterey, Monterey County District Attorney's Office. (Lyons, Ellen) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mutalipassi, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action in Complaint ) filed bySalinas Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mutalipassi, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Stacey Weigelt. Monterey County Family Courts served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Weigelt, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Stacey Weigelt. Salinas Police Department served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Weigelt, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Stacey Weigelt. Monterey County District Attorney's Office served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Weigelt, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] *Re-File as Summons Returned Executed* Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #15 Certificate of Service, filed by Brian Stacey Weigelt, #16 Certificate of Service, filed by Brian Stacey Weigelt, #17 Certificate of Service, filed by Brian Stacey Weigelt (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss by State Court Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Superior Court of California, County of Monterey filed byBrian Stacey Weigelt. (Weigelt, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2019) (Entered: 06/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement [FRCP 12(b)(6), 12(e)] ) Monterey County District Attorney filed byBrian Stacey Weigelt. (Weigelt, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2019) (Entered: 06/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/21/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Proposed Order re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action in Complaint, #8 Request for Judicial Notice by Salinas Police Department. (Mutalipassi, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Judicial Notice re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action in Complaint filed bySalinas Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Mutalipassi, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action in Complaint filed by Salinas Police Department. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/1/2019. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mutalipassi, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing #5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Letter, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Brian Weigelt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Monterey County District Attorney's Office, Monterey County Family Courts, Salinas Police Department. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Weigelt. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against County Of Monterey, Monterey County District Attorney's Office, Monterey County Family Courts, Salinas Police Department. Filed byBrian Weigelt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.