This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2022 at 08:08:05 (UTC).

Wei v. Mayorkas et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Wei filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nicholas G. Garaufis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01031

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUXIANG WEI

Defendants

District Director Thomas Cioppa

USCIS Director Ur M. Jaddou

Secretary of DOH Alejandro Mayorkas

DIRECTOR MILLER K LOREN

Director USCIS Loren K. Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jiancheng Zhu

Attorney at Law Offices of Jiancheng Zhu

1441 Broadway 6Fl, Suite 6037

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Affidavit Affidavit

1 #2

Appearance of Counsel

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibits A, B, C, D

1 #5

Summons

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) APPROVED #5 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. The payment inthe amount of $402, Rcpt No. ANYEDC-15325336 is to be refunded - Tiffeny Lee-Harris, Case Processing Supevisor, on 3/8/2022. (forwarded for processing) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPROVED #5 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. The payment inthe amount of $402, Rcpt No. ANYEDC-15325336 is to be refunded - Tiffeny Lee-Harris, Case Processing Supevisor, on 3/8/2022. (forwarded for processing) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Houxiang Wei. (Attachments: #1 First Payment, #2 Second Payment) (Zhu, Jiancheng) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15325589 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by HOUXIANG WEI. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Appearance of Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A, B, C, D, #5 Summons) (Zhu, Jiancheng) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where District Director Thomas Cioppa is a litigant