Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2020 at 12:26:37 (UTC).

Weems v. Myers et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Weems filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Myers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER and THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

Referral Judge

THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Weems

Defendants

SGT MYERS

Officer Speed

Officer Samuels

WARDEN BERRY

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee of $29.50. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 6/9/2020. (TQL) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#10

(#10) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to Patrick Weems (bcl) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01788. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER adopting the #4 Final Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court. This action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, Albany Division. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/19/2020. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#6

No Description Available

#5

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patrick Weems re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tcc) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

4 #1

Report and Recommendation

#4

Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#3

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patrick Weems re #3 Order and NEF. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

Notification of Docket Correction re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, correct PDF attached to the end of the docket entry and NEF has been regenerated. (tcc) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketFiling fee Paid: Initial Partial Filing Fee $29.50 (dht) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee of $29.50. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 6/9/2020. (TQL) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to Patrick Weems (bcl) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketUS DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF added. (bcl) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01788. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patrick Weems re #7 Order. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER adopting the #4 Final Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court. This action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, Albany Division. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/19/2020. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patrick Weems re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tcc) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, correct PDF attached to the end of the docket entry and NEF has been regenerated. (tcc) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patrick Weems re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Patrick Weems. (tcc) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 4/30/2020. (tcc) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Albany Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 4/29/2020. (tcc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2020: #1 Report and Recommendation) (tcc). [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patrick Weems re #3 Order and NEF. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Patrick Weems. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Patrick Weems. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 5/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less