This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2020 at 16:10:38 (UTC).

Weeks v. Anfi, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Weeks filed an Other lawsuit against Anfi, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Herman N Johnson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00985

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Herman N Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dexter Weeks

Defendant

Anfi, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronald C Sykstus

Attorney at BOND BOTES SYKSTUS TANNER & EZZELL PC

225 Pratt Avenue

Huntsville, AL 35801

David J. Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd.

9760 S. Roberts Road, Suite One

Palos Hills, IL 60465

Mary Elizabeth Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd.

9760 S. Roberts Road, Suite One

Palos Hills, IL 60465

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: the court STAYS all current deadlines until October 15, 2020. The parties shall take appropriate action to perfect settlement by October 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/31/20. (BJL) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Dexter Weeks of Settlement (Philipps, David) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Anfi, Inc. mailed certified mail (MEB2) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Dexter Weeks (Sykstus, Ronald) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff Dexter Weeks filed a Motion for Leave for Mary E. Philipps and David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Within 10 days of the entry day of this order, counsel shall comply with all requirements of Local Rule 83.1(b), particularly regarding payment of the prescribed admission fee for each application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/10/20. (BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Motion is RIPE 7/10/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Dexter Weeks. (BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Dexter Weeks. (BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT wit JURY DEMAND against Anfi, Inc. filed by Dexter Weeks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: the court STAYS all current deadlines until October 15, 2020. The parties shall take appropriate action to perfect settlement by October 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/31/20. (BJL) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Dexter Weeks of Settlement (Philipps, David) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Anfi, Inc. mailed certified mail (MEB2) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Dexter Weeks (Sykstus, Ronald) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601107105 (BJL) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601107104 (BJL) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601107103 (BJL) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff Dexter Weeks filed a Motion for Leave for Mary E. Philipps and David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Within 10 days of the entry day of this order, counsel shall comply with all requirements of Local Rule 83.1(b), particularly regarding payment of the prescribed admission fee for each application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/10/20. (BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Motion is RIPE 7/10/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Dexter Weeks. (BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Dexter Weeks. (BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT wit JURY DEMAND against Anfi, Inc. filed by Dexter Weeks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less