This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2021 at 15:34:56 (UTC).

Wedge Water LLC v. Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Wedge Water LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and Barbara Lynn Major. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00809

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

Barbara Lynn Major

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wedge Water LLC doing business as Wave Soda

Defendants

Does 1 through 25

Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Levine

Attorney at BraunHagey & Borden LLP

351 California Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

John Roger Snyder

Attorney at Potomac Law Group, PLLC

101 Federal Street, Suite 1900

Boston, MA 02110

Marci Lerner Miller

Attorney at Potomac Law Group

1303 Avocado Avenue, Suite 230

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Janet F. Satterthwaite

Attorney at Potomac Law Group

1300 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20004

Julia Anne Matheson

Attorney at Potomac Law Group

1300 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wedge Water LLC, as to Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Levine, Andrew) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#32

(#32) *** WITHDRAWN PER MJ CHAMBERS *** ORDER Granting Joint #31 Motion for Protective Order With Modifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/16/21. (dlg) Modified on 6/17/2021 to withdraw entry, corrected order to follow (dlg). (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#31

(#31) Joint MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidentiality by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Miller, Marci) (dlg). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#28

(#28) ORDER Denying #25 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/26/21. (dlg) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#27

(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Supplemental) filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Snyder, John) (dlg). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance of Julia Anne Matheson by Marci Lerner Miller on behalf of Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. (Miller, Marci) QC email, incorrect filer, attorney should withdraw and refile correctly (dlg). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 MOTION to Stay : Responses due by 5/28/2021, Replies due by 6/14/2021. A hearing is set on July 9, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/4/21.(dlg) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Miller, Marci) (dlg). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Miller, Marci) (dlg). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Marci Lerner Miller by Marci Lerner Miller on behalf of Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. (Miller, Marci)Attorney Marci Lerner Miller added to party Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda) (jms). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *5571632*, *88850989*, *4641901* cc:USPTO (zda) (jms). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE Pertinent to Pending Motion to Stay by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Marci) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wedge Water LLC, as to Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Levine, Andrew) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) *** WITHDRAWN PER MJ CHAMBERS *** ORDER Granting Joint #31 Motion for Protective Order With Modifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/16/21. (dlg) Modified on 6/17/2021 to withdraw entry, corrected order to follow (dlg). (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Joint MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidentiality by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Miller, Marci) (dlg). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janet Satterthwaite in Further Support of Ocean Spray's Motion to Stay)(Miller, Marci) (dlg). (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay filed by Wedge Water LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Levine)(Levine, Andrew) (dlg). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER Denying #25 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/26/21. (dlg) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Supplemental) filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Snyder, John) (dlg). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance of Julia Anne Matheson by Julia Anne Matheson on behalf of Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. (Matheson, Julia)Attorney Julia Anne Matheson added to party Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.(pty:dft) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Wedge Water LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew Levine, #3 Declaration of Nathaniel Noone)(Levine, Andrew) (dlg). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15694693.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Snyder, John) (rmc). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance of Julia Anne Matheson by Marci Lerner Miller on behalf of Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. (Miller, Marci) QC email, incorrect filer, attorney should withdraw and refile correctly (dlg). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 MOTION to Stay : Responses due by 5/28/2021, Replies due by 6/14/2021. A hearing is set on July 9, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/4/21.(dlg) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Miller, Marci) (dlg). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Miller, Marci) (dlg). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Declaration Declaration of Janet Satterthwaite)(Miller, Marci) (dlg). Modified on 5/18/2021 to send qc email for courtesy copies (dlg). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Marci Lerner Miller by Marci Lerner Miller on behalf of Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. (Miller, Marci)Attorney Marci Lerner Miller added to party Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda) (jms). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *5571632*, *88850989*, *4641901* cc:USPTO (zda) (jms). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BCASDC-15655472.), filed by Wedge Water LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-809-GPC-BLM. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Levine, Andrew)(zda) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc Welfare Benefits Plan is a litigant