This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2022 at 07:12:57 (UTC).

Webster v. Williams et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Webster filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Shadid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01164

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tony Webster

Defendants

. Williams

. Gall

. Gousi

Nurse Hannah

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tony Webster.(SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Tony Webster.(SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Tony Webster. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#6

(#6) Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 5/24/2022. (SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust fund ledger sheets due by 5/24/2022. (SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Tony Webster. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Tony Webster (SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Tony Webster.(SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tony Webster.(SAG) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Galls, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAMS is a litigant