This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2023 at 11:06:09 (UTC).

Webster v. Salem Group, Inc., The

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 Webster filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Salem Group, Inc , The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04388

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Drew Webster

Defendant

Salem Group, Inc., The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maureen Ann Salas

Andrew Dunlap

Douglas M. Werman

Defendant Attorneys

Raseq Moizuddin

Jeffrey L Rudd

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties' next status report is due 4/17/23, and the court expects the parties to offer more detail about the progress of the case and negotiations. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#31

(#31) STATUS Report Joint by Drew Webster (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#30

(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall file a status report on the progress of settlement on 4/3/23. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#29

(#29) STATUS Report Joint by Drew Webster (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

28 #1

Exhibit A. Consent

28 #28

Main Document

27 #1

Exhibit A. Consent

27 #27

Main Document

#26

(#26) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Filing Notice of Consent (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#25

(#25) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Filing Notice of Consents (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drew Webster as to Salem Group, Inc., The on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Andrew Dunlap (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#5

(#5) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 294(b). Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/19/2022. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Maureen Ann Salas (Salas, Maureen) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Douglas M. Werman (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent Form

1 #1

Main Document

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties' next status report is due 4/17/23, and the court expects the parties to offer more detail about the progress of the case and negotiations. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STATUS Report Joint by Drew Webster (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall file a status report on the progress of settlement on 4/3/23. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STATUS Report Joint by Drew Webster (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Consent for Brett Patrick (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Consent)(Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Consent for Max Zschau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Consent)(Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Filing Notice of Consent (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Filing Notice of Consents (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Salem Group, Inc., The (Rudd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drew Webster as to Salem Group, Inc., The on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Andrew Dunlap (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 294(b). Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/19/2022. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Salem Group, Inc. (smb, ) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Maureen Ann Salas (Salas, Maureen) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Douglas M. Werman (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Original Collective & Class Action Complaint) filed by Drew Webster; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19755352. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less