This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2023 at 21:47:34 (UTC).

Webster v. Salem Group, Inc., The

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 Webster filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Salem Group, Inc , The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04388

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Drew Webster

Defendant

Salem Group, Inc., The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Llp

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Maureen Ann Salas

Attorney at Werman Salas P.C.

77 W. Washington, Suite 1402

Chicago, IL 60602

Douglas M. Werman

Attorney at Werman Salas P.C.

77 West Washington, Suite 1402

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey L Rudd

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (Chicago)

150 N. Michigan Ave, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Raseq Moizuddin

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

150 N. Michigan Avenue, 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Filing Notice of Consent (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Filing Notice of Consent (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#20

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall file a status report by 3/3/2023. (mss) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#19

(#19) STATUS Report Regarding Conditional Certification and Proposed Scheduling Order by Drew Webster (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#18

(#18) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/7/2022. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The court approves the parties' stipulation of conditional certification and plan for notice. The parties shall file a status report with a proposed scheduling order on 11/28/22. Enter stipulation. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

16 #2

Exhibit B - Phone and Email Script

16 #1

Exhibit A - Notice and Consent Form

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #10 is granted. Defendant's response to the complaint is due 10/13/22. The parties shall exchange initial disclosures by 11/14/22, the parties may begin discovery. The court will set a deadline for completing discovery after the parties confer about conditional certification. The parties shall file a status report on 11/4/22 with any proposals for conditional certification or briefing a motion for conditional certification. An agreed proposed confidentiality order may be submitted to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties may contact susan_mcclintic@ilnd.uscourts.gov for a settlement referral. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drew Webster as to Salem Group, Inc., The on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Andrew Dunlap (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#5

(#5) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 294(b). Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/19/2022. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Maureen Ann Salas (Salas, Maureen) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Douglas M. Werman (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent Form

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Filing Notice of Consent (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE by Drew Webster of Filing Notice of Consent (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall file a status report by 3/3/2023. (mss) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STATUS Report Regarding Conditional Certification and Proposed Scheduling Order by Drew Webster (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/7/2022. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The court approves the parties' stipulation of conditional certification and plan for notice. The parties shall file a status report with a proposed scheduling order on 11/28/22. Enter stipulation. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION regarding order on motion for extension of time,,, terminate motions,,, set deadlines,, #14 and Proposed Order Regarding Conditional Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice and Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B - Phone and Email Script)(Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT THE SALEM GROUP, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE AND OTHER DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COLLECTIVE & CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Salem Group, Inc., The(Rudd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #10 is granted. Defendant's response to the complaint is due 10/13/22. The parties shall exchange initial disclosures by 11/14/22, the parties may begin discovery. The court will set a deadline for completing discovery after the parties confer about conditional certification. The parties shall file a status report on 11/4/22 with any proposals for conditional certification or briefing a motion for conditional certification. An agreed proposed confidentiality order may be submitted to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties may contact susan_mcclintic@ilnd.uscourts.gov for a settlement referral. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drew Webster as to Salem Group, Inc., The on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Andrew Dunlap (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 294(b). Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/19/2022. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Salem Group, Inc. (smb, ) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Maureen Ann Salas (Salas, Maureen) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Drew Webster by Douglas M. Werman (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Original Collective & Class Action Complaint) filed by Drew Webster; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19755352. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Salem Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey L Rudd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raseq Moizuddin