This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 10:47:54 (UTC).

Webster v. Bosecker et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Webster filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Bosecker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Shadid. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01241

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Webster

Pontiac, IL 61764

Defendants

. Bridwell

. Givens

. Aushbrook

Matt Bosecker

Deanna Brookheart

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Steven Webster. Responses due by 7/9/2020 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Steven Webster.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Webster.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketRemark: This case has been opened in the SDIL as case 3:20-cv-00632. (TK, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 6/25/2020. The Plaintiff, a state prisoner, has submitted a civil rights complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. #1 . Such actions may be brought only in (1) the judicial district where any defendant resides (if all defendants reside in the same State), (2) a judicial district in which a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred, or (3) a judicial district in which any defendant may be found, if there is no district in which the action may otherwise be brought. See 28 U.S.C. 1391(b). The Plaintiff's claims involve Defendants and events at Lawrence Correctional Center in Lawrence County, Illinois, which is situated in the federal judicial district for the Southern District of Illinois. Therefore, the Court finds venue over this proceeding lies in the Southern District of Illinois, and it is in the interests of justice that this cause be transferred there. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Steven Webster. Responses due by 7/9/2020 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Steven Webster.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven Webster.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less