This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 at 07:14:35 (UTC).

Webster et al v. City Of New York

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Webster filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City Of New York. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05638

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gregory Webster

LISA WEBSTER

Defendants

The City Of New York,

City Of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Scott Fraser

Attorney at The Dweck Law Firm, LLP

75 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorney

Erik March Zissu

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street, 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Erik Zissu dated 08/06/19. Document filed by City Of New York.(Zissu, Erik) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/22/2019) (rro) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik March Zissu on behalf of City Of New York. (Zissu, Erik) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17098717)Document filed by Gregory Webster, LISA WEBSTER.(Fraser, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. City Of New York served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Mezyck - Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Gregory Webster; Lisa Webster. (Fraser, Christopher) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (pc) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraser, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application GRANTED. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond is hereby extended until August 16, 2019. (City Of New York answer due 8/16/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/6/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by LISA WEBSTER, Gregory Webster. (Fraser, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application GRANTED. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond is hereby extended until August 16, 2019. (City Of New York answer due 8/16/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/6/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Erik Zissu dated 08/06/19. Document filed by City Of New York.(Zissu, Erik) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik March Zissu on behalf of City Of New York. (Zissu, Erik) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/22/2019) (rro) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. City Of New York served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Mezyck - Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Gregory Webster; Lisa Webster. (Fraser, Christopher) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (pc) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher Scott Fraser. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher Scott Fraser. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: LISA WEBSTER, Gregory Webster, The City Of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by LISA WEBSTER, Gregory Webster. (Fraser, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraser, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17098717)Document filed by Gregory Webster, LISA WEBSTER.(Fraser, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.